Wilson et al v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Sanders, Jolina Manley, Susan Canada, Heather Age, Jessica David, Cassandra Martell, Tiffanie Skibicki, Teresa Wilson and Tabatha Sidi
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00334
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Pursuant to the #12 Stipulation and Order, this action is now consolidated under the LEAD CASE (1:21-cv-133). All filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE. NO FURTHER DOCKETING SHALL BE DONE IN THIS CASE. (amt)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION & ORDER TO DISMISS Does 1 through 10 Without Prejudice, Extend Beech-Nut's Time to Answer, and to Consolidate: Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss without prejudice plaintiffs claims against defendants named in the caption of the subject action as Does 1 - 10; Plaintiffs and Beech-Nut agree that, with the voluntary dismissal of claims against the Doe defendants, this action now may be consolidated with the Consolidated Action for pre-trialpurposes pursuant to paragraph 4 of the Courts March 19, 2021 Order in the Consolidated Action. Beech-Nuts deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint in this Action is mooted and Beech-Nuts deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond shall be at such time as may be applicable in the Consolidated Action to the operative complaint in that action. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/7/2021. (see)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Dismiss Doe Defendants Without Prejudice, Extend Beech-Nut's Time to Answer, and to Consolidate filed by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Hero Beteiligungen AG, Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Hero AG, Corporate Parent Schwartau International GmbH, Corporate Parent AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech-Nut Nutrition Company.. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (McCarthy, Kathleen)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Sanders, Susan Canada, Tiffanie Skibicki, Jessica David, Heather Age, Cassandra Martell, Teresa Wilson, Tabatha Sidi, Jolina Manley. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Lynch, Gary)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Heather Age, Susan Canada, Jessica David, Jolina Manley, Cassandra Martell, Ryan Sanders, Tabatha Sidi, Tiffanie Skibicki, Teresa Wilson re #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, #4 Notice of Admission Requirement (Lynch, Gary)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 4/6/2021. (amt)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiffs; Attorney Scott G. Braden, Email address is sbraden@carlsonlynch.com. Phone number is 619-762-1900. Admissions due by 4/8/2021. {Emailed to attorney on 3/25/2021}(see)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiffs; Attorney Todd D. Carpenter, Email address is tcarpenter@carlsonlynch.com. Phone number is 619-762-1900. Admissions due by 4/8/2021. {Emailed to attorney on 3/25/2021}(see)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/16/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (see)
March 25, 2021 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named Does 1-10 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "Does 1-10" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see, )
March 25, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:21-CV-133, 1:21-cv-00167, 1:21-cv-00183, 1:21-cv-00200, 1:21-cv-00213, 1:21-cv-00229, 1:21-cv-00258, 1:21-cv-00258, 1:21-cv-00285. (see)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company and Does 1 through 10 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5469225) filed by Ryan Sanders, Susan Canada, Tiffanie Skibicki, Jessica David, Heather Age, Cassandra Martell, Teresa Wilson, Tabatha Sidi, and Jolina Manley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Represented By: Kathleen E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Sanders
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolina Manley
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Canada
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Age
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica David
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Martell
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffanie Skibicki
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabatha Sidi
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?