Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2021cv00355
Filed: March 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Norman A Mordue
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, subject to the additional conditions set forth in Attachment "A." Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/20/2021. (kmc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (James, Jacqueline)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Granting #4 Plaintiff's Letter Request for permission to file a Motion seeking Leave to File a Third Party Subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) and adjourn without date an Initial Rule 16 Conference until the defendant in this action is named and served. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/16/2021. (kmc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Jacqueline M. James for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC requesting Leave to File a Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Adjourn Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference submitted to Judge Baxter . (James, Jacqueline)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting 3/30/2021 Notice of Related Case and Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on 4/7/2021. (rjb, )
March 30, 2021 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerks Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a John Doe defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summonses will be issued at that time. (khr)
March 30, 2021 TEXT NOTICE pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 3:20-cv-1577, 5:20-cv-247, 5:21-cv-34. (khr)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) (khr)(Copy mailed on 3/29/2021)
March 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5473453) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?