Handyside v. Bernard Atkins et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Handyside
Defendant: Etsy, Inc. and Bernard Atkins
Case Number: 1:2021cv00422
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to #5 Report and Recommendations by Shawn Handyside. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope)(hmr)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT-RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: Ordered that, Based upon the information provided in Plaintiff's Motion, this Court determines that Plaintiff has the ability to pre-pay the entire $402 filing fee required to maintain this action. Plaintiff does not meet the requirements in order to proceed IFP. The #2 application to proceed without prepayment of fees is DENIED. The Court recommends that the District Court dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint if he does not submit the filing fee, or submit additional information indicating that he is unable to pay such fee, within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Report-Recommendation and Order.( Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2021, Case Review Deadline 5/3/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/16/2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(mgh)
April 16, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance to Submit Required Filing Fee Deadline 5/17/2021 (mgh)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (dpk)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed (dpk)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shawn Handyside (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Bernard Atkins, #2 Proposed Summons as to Etsy, Inc.) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (dpk)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bernard Atkins and Etsy, Inc. filed by Shawn Handyside. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handyside v. Bernard Atkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etsy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Handyside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?