Dolan-Weiss v. Weiss et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Dolan-Weiss
Defendant: Brian M. Weiss and Michael Weiss Trust No. 1 of 2018
Case Number: 1:2021cv00533
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Weiss Trust No. 1 of 2018, Brian M. Weiss. Motion returnable before Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. filed by Melissa Dolan-Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Alter, Daniel)
June 29, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by Melissa Dolan-Weiss. (Alter, Daniel)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Weiss Trust No. 1 of 2018, Brian M. Weiss. Motion returnable before Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. Response to Motion due by 7/13/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Attorney Affirmation, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-Nuptial Agreement, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-Trust Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C-Trustee's Acknowledgment, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D-Complaint, #6 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law) (Towne, James)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Towne, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Towne, James)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Alter on behalf of Melissa Dolan-Weiss (Alter, Daniel)
June 9, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Michael Weiss Trust No. 1 of 2018 answer due 6/22/2021; Brian M. Weiss answer due 6/22/2021. (map)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet served on Michael Weiss Trust on June 1, 2021, filed by Melissa Dolan-Weiss. (Alter, Daniel)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet served on Brian M. Weiss on June 1, 2021, filed by Melissa Dolan-Weiss. (Alter, Daniel)
May 11, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY regarding Exhibit A to the #1 Complaint. Attachment (1) Exhibit A: Nupital Agreement and Statements of Assets, Liabilities and Net Worth replaced on 5/11/2021 with redacted version due to personal identifiers found within the original document. (map)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/2/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Attorney for Plaintiff Daniel S. Alter, Esq. Served via email address at: daniel@yankwitt.com. Phone number of counsel is: (914) 686-1500. Admissions due by 5/24/2021. (map)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brian M. Weiss, and Michael Weiss Trust No. 1 of 2018 (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Michael Weiss Trust No. 1 of 2018)(map)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Michael Weiss Trust No. 1 of 2018, Brian M. Weiss (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5517649) filed by Melissa Dolan-Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Nupital Agreement and Statements of Assets, Liabilities and Net Worth, #2 Exhibit B: Trust Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolan-Weiss v. Weiss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dolan-Weiss
Represented By: Russell M. Yankwitt
Represented By: Daniel S. Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M. Weiss
Represented By: James T. Towne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weiss Trust No. 1 of 2018
Represented By: James T. Towne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?