Yerdon v. Poitras et al
Plaintiff: Edward A. Yerdon
Defendant: Karin Poitras, NY Dept of Motor Vehicles and Elizabeth Romand
Case Number: 1:2021cv00565
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #12 is GRANTED. Defendant Elizabeth Romand is directed to respond to the complaint by 8/31/2021. Plaintiff's Motion #10 , seeking to obtain ECF Login, will be addressed at the Rule 16 initial conference. The Rule 16 initial conference remains scheduled for 9/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m., via telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/22/2021. (Copy served upon Pltf via regular mail)(amt)
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 Letter Motion from AAG Lynn M. Knapp for Elizabeth Romand requesting extension of time to respond to complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (Knapp, Lynn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward A. Yerdon. Elizabeth Romand served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (khr)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Edward A. Yerdon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment-Pro Se CM/ECF Registration Form) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (khr)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #8 is GRANTED. Defendants NY Dept of Motor Vehicles and Karin Poitras are directed to respond to the complaint by 8/31/2021. The Rule 16 initial conference scheduled for 8/25/2021 is re-scheduled for 9/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m., via telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/2/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/2/2021. (copy of text order served on pro se Plaintiff via regular mail) (jdp )
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 Letter Motion from AAG Lynn M. Knapp for NY Dept of Motor Vehicles, Karin Poitras requesting extension of time to respond to complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (Knapp, Lynn)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward A. Yerdon. Karin Poitras served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (khr)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward A. Yerdon. NY Dept of Motor Vehicles served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (khr)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Romand. (khr)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed on 5/17/2021 (khr)(Provided pro se plaintiff with a copy of all filed documents, pro se handbook, pro se notice, local rules)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (877) 402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. Initial Conference set for 8/25/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/18/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Karin Poitras. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to NY Dept of Motor Vehicles)(khr)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against NY Dept of Motor Vehicles, Karin Poitras (Filing fee $402 receipt number ALB012089) filed by Edward A. Yerdon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yerdon v. Poitras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward A. Yerdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karin Poitras
Represented By: Lynn Marie Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Dept of Motor Vehicles
Represented By: Lynn Marie Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Romand
Represented By: Lynn Marie Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?