Dibble v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Deirdre A. Dibble
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00676
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #8 Affidavit of Service - Corrected text to reflect that an affidavit of service was filed as to Albany Stratton VA Medical Center with a service date of 6/16/21. (jel, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #7 Affidavit of Service - Corrected date to reflect service of 6/15/2021 instead of 5/15/2021. (jel, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ransom P. Reynolds, III on behalf of The United States of America (Reynolds, Ransom)
June 22, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for The United States of America answer due 8/14/2021. (jel, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, complaint, Certificate of Merit, Filing Order, Civil Cover Sheet served on US Attorney's Office for Northern District of NY on 6/15/21 and on Albany Stratton VA Medical Center on 6/16/21 filed by Deirdre A. Dibble. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Keenholts, Meghan) Modified on 6/24/2021 (jel, ).
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, complaint, Certificate of Merit, Filing Order, Civil Cover Sheet served on US Attorney General, Washington, D.C on 6/15/21, filed by Deirdre A. Dibble. (Keenholts, Meghan) Modified on 6/22/2021 (jel, ).
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The United States of America. (Summons issued for Albany Stratton VA Medical Center0 (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for U.S. Attorney General)(jel, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Deirdre A. Dibble is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Keenholts, Meghan)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Deirdre A. Dibble is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Keenholts, Meghan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance inititating conference calls to the Court. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/2/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The United States of America. (jel, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5550194) filed by Deirdre A. Dibble, as Administratix of the Estate of Daniel T. Seip, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dibble v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Ransom P. Reynolds, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deirdre A. Dibble
Represented By: Meghan Rielly Keenholts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?