O'Connor v. New York State, Department of Financial Services
Plaintiff: Barbara O'Connor
Defendant: New York State, Department of Financial Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv00828
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Barbara O'Connor against New York State, Department of Financial Services filed by Barbara O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Revised, #2 Exhibit(s) A - US EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Exhibit(s) B -US EEOC Email Dated April 21, 2021)(Hartt, James)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Granting #5 Letter Request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. New York State, Department of Financial Services answer due 10/1/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/1/2021. (kmc)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Assistant Attorney General Keith Starlin for New York State, Department of Financial Services requesting an extension of time for defendant to respond to the Complaint with consent of all parties submitted to Judge Hon. Andrew T. Baxter . (Starlin, Keith)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara O'Connor. New York State, Department of Financial Services served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Hartt, James)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 10/20/2021 at 10:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/13/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State, Department of Financial Services. (pjh, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against New York State, Department of Financial Services (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5588872) filed by Barbara O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Right To Sue letter by the EEOC, #2 Exhibit B - Email from EEOC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. New York State, Department of Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara O'Connor
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State, Department of Financial Services
Represented By: Keith J. Starlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?