Willey v. Town of Clifton Park et al
Plaintiff: Carlton B. Willey and Carl Willey
Defendant: "John" Walsh, Town of Clifton Park, Shenendehowa Central School District, Clifton Park Soccer Club, Inc., Peter Clinton, Spike Walsh, Peter Sands and Richard Paul Keefer
Case Number: 1:2021cv00877
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shenendehowa Central School District. Motion returnable before Judge Daniel J. Stewart Response to Motion due by 10/18/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Meacham, Norma)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton B. Willey. "John" Walsh served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (Horn, Charles)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the Stipulations filed on August 27, 2021, Dkt. Nos. #13 and #15 , the deadline in which Defendants, Shenendehowa Central School District and Town of Clifton Park, are to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter is extended to September 27, 2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/30/2021. (mab)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendant Town of Clifton Park by Carlton B. Willey submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (Horn, Charles)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Rose Lenahan on behalf of Shenendehowa Central School District (Lenahan, Monica)
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Shenendehowa Central School District submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (Meacham, Norma)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Norma G. Meacham on behalf of Shenendehowa Central School District (Meacham, Norma)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilda Marinello Curtin on behalf of Shenendehowa Central School District (Curtin, Hilda)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton B. Willey. Clifton Park Soccer Club, Inc. served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (Horn, Charles)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton B. Willey. Peter Clinton served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (Horn, Charles)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton B. Willey. (Horn, Charles)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton B. Willey. Peter Sands served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (Horn, Charles)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton B. Willey. Town of Clifton Park served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Horn, Charles)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton B. Willey. Shenendehowa Central School District served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Horn, Charles)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton B. Willey. Richard Paul Keefer served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (Horn, Charles)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/3/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/27/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Town of Clifton Park. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Clifton Park Soccer Club, #2 Summons issued to John Walsh, #3 Summons issued to Peter Clinton, #4 Summons issued to Peter Sands, #5 Summons issued to Richard Paul Keefer, #6 Summons issued to Shenendehowa Central School District)(khr)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Clifton Park Soccer Club, Inc., Peter Clinton, Richard Paul Keefer, Peter Sands, Shenendehowa Central School District, Town of Clifton Park, "John" Walsh (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5605439) filed by Carlton B. Willey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willey v. Town of Clifton Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton B. Willey
Represented By: Charles H. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Willey
Represented By: Charles H. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "John" Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Clifton Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenendehowa Central School District
Represented By: Hilda Marinello Curtin
Represented By: Monica Rose Lenahan
Represented By: Norma G. Meacham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Park Soccer Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spike Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Paul Keefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?