Krom et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chester Krom and Dorothy Miller
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01050
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E. Bidzinski on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Bidzinski, Joshua)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/19/2021. (mab)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Agreed HIPAA Qualified Protective Order to be "So Ordered" (Lane, Thomas)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MANDATORY MEDIATION PROGRAM: This case is referred to participation in the Mandatory Mediation Program. The parties should refer to General Order #47. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/1/2022. The deadline for the parties file a Stipulation selecting a Mediator is 12/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/10/2021. (mab)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 7 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2022. Discovery due by 12/16/2022. Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure Deadline is 9/19/2022. Defendant's Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/1/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 11/16/2022. Motions to be filed by 1/23/2023. Status Report due by 2/11/2022. The Court has discussed Mandatory Mediation with the parties and will issue a separate Order referring this action into the Mandatory Mediation Program. The deadline to complete Mandatory Mediation is 8/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/10/2021. (mab)
November 8, 2021 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2021. Appearances: John DeGasperis, Esq. for Plaintffs; Thomas Lane, Esq. and Josh Bidzinski, Esq. for Defendant. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions and how they intend to proceed in this matter. Mandatory Disclosures have been exchanged. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. (TIME: 9:35AM-9:46AM). (mab)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joshua Erik Bidzinski is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Defendant. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/3/2021. (mab)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 Supplemental Admission documents re: #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Lane, Thomas)
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Lane, Thomas)
October 20, 2021 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua E. Bidzinski. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Erik Bidzinski Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5679900. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor Thomas S. Lane, #2 Joshua Erik Bidzinski Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing for Joshua Erik Bidzinski, #4 Joshua Erik Bidzinski New Attorney E-filing Registration Form) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Lane, Thomas)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Chester Krom re #3 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 State Court Complaint Attorney Affirmation (DeGasperis, John)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chester Krom. (DeGasperis, John)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (egr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Joshua E. Bidzinski, Email address is jbidzinski@smbtrials.com. Phone number is 312-321-9100. Admissions due by 10/6/2021. (egr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Mehwish Aslam, Email address is maslam@smbtrials.com. Phone number is 312-321-9100. Admissions due by 10/6/2021. (egr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Anthony J. Monaco, Email address is amonaco@smbtrials.com. Phone number is 312-321-9100. Admissions due by 10/6/2021. (egr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/1/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (egr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to STATE COURT Complaint by Smith & Nephew, Inc.(egr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (egr)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND from NYS Supreme Court - County of Ulster, case number 5F2021-348 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5656428) filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) #6 Certificate of Compliance, #7 Certificate of Service) (egr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krom et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Krom
Represented By: John A. DeGasperis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Miller
Represented By: John A. DeGasperis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas S. Lane
Represented By: Joshua E. Bidzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?