Perez v. New York State Department of Health et al
Plaintiff: Patricia S. Perez
Defendant: New York State Department of Health and Howard A. Zucker
Case Number: 1:2021cv01203
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 Joint Letter Motion from Plaintiff's Counsel, Elizabeth Brehm for Patricia S. Perez requesting Adjournment of Rule 16 status scheduling conference submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Brehm, Elizabeth)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 First Letter Motion from Jorge A. Rodriguez, AAG for New York State Department of Health, Howard A. Zucker requesting extension of time to answer or move against Complaint : New York State Department of Health answer due 1/14/2022; Howard A. Zucker answer due 1/14/2022. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/2/2021. (tab)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 First Letter Motion from Jorge A. Rodriguez, AAG for New York State Department of Health, Howard A. Zucker requesting extension of time to answer or move against Complaint submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby, USDJ . (Rodriguez, Jorge)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Notice of General Order No. 25, Civil Management Plan, Civil Assignment Form, and Consent to Excercise of Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge served on Howard Zucker, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of New York Department of Health on 11/09/2021, filed by Patricia S. Perez. (Brehm, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for New York State Department of Health answer due 12/3/2021; Howard A. Zucker answer due 12/3/2021. (map)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Notice of General Order No. 25, Civil Management Plan, Civil Assignment Form, and Consent to Excercise of Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge served on New York State Department of Health and Howard Zucker, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of New York State Health Department of Health on 11/12/2021, filed by Patricia S. Perez. (Brehm, Elizabeth)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Conference set for 02/02/2022 at 9:00 AM in Albany before U.S. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/26/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State Department of Health, Howard A. Zucker. (map)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York State Department of Health, Howard A. Zucker (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5703089) filed by Patricia S. Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. New York State Department of Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia S. Perez
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Jorge A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard A. Zucker
Represented By: Jorge A. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?