Santicola v. Hunter-Tannersville Central School District et al
Plaintiff: Ronald V. Santicola
Defendant: Hunter-Tannersville Central School District, President Joseph Biden, Vice President Kamala Harris, Senator Charles Schumer, Congresswoman Nancy Pelosi, Secretary of State Antony Blinken, Director of FBI Christopher Wray, Govenor Kathy Hochul, John L. Hennessy, Sundar Pichal, Pope Francis and Attorney General Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2022cv00029
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER DISMISSING CASE that, because such a #9 notice of voluntary dismissal is self-executing, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the action. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/25/2022. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail) (sal)
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i).(mgh) Modified on 1/25/2022 to change from a letter motion to a ntc. of vol. dismissal (sal ).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket. The Court is in the process of reviewing the complaint for sufficiency under 28 USC Section 1915(e)(2) and will issue a determination in due time. However, since Plaintiff paid the requisite filing fee, the Clerk is directed to issue the summonses and Plaintiff is solely responsible for serving the respective summons and complaint on each of the defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the NDNY Local Rules. The Court also has before it a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a Motion to Appoint Counsel, which will also be decided by the Court in due course. Because the Court is conducting an initial review, the 4/14/2022 initial conference (see General Order 25) and the related deadlines of exchange of Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures and filing of a Civil Case Management Plan are adjourned without new date at this time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/18/2022. (A copy of this Text Order has been served on pro se party(ies) via regular mail.(sg)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket. The Court is in the process of reviewing the complaint for sufficiency under 28 USC Section 1915 before it can direct service of the complaint and will issue a determination in due time. The Court also has before it a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a Motion to Appoint Counsel, which will also be decided by the Court in due course. Because the Court is conducting an initial review, the 4/14/2022 initial conference (see General Order 25) and the related deadlines of exchange of Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures and filing of a Civil Case Management Plan are adjourned without new date at this time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/18/2022. (A copy of this Text Order has been served on pro se party(ies) via regular mail.)(sg)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Ronald V. Santicola on 1/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Pro Se Notice) (mgh)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/14/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/7/2022. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ronald V. Santicola. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (mgh)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with attachments filed by Ronald V. Santicola Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (mgh)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joseph Biden, Antony Blinken, Francis, Kamala Harris, John L. Hennessy, Kathy Hochul, Hunter-Tannersville Central School District, Nancy Pelosi, Sundar Pichal, Charles Schumer, Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to President Joseph Biden, #2 Summmons Issued as to Vice President Kamala Harris, #3 Summons Issued as to Senator Charles Schumer, #4 Summons Issued as to Congresswoman Nancy Pelosi, #5 Summons Issued as to Secretary of State Antony J. Blinken, #6 Summons Issued as to Attorney General Merrick B. Garland, #7 Summons Issued as to Director of the FBI Christopher Wray, #8 Summons Issued as to Governor Kathy Hochul, #9 Summons Issued as to Chairman John L. Hennessy, #10 Summons Issued as to CEO Sundar Pichal, #11 Summons Issued as to Pope Francis)(mgh)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Biden, Antony Blinken, Francis, Kamala Harris, John L. Hennessy, Kathy Hochul, Hunter-Tannersville Central School District, Nancy Pelosi, Sundar Pichal, Charles Schumer, Christopher Wray and Merrick Garland.(Filing fee $402 receipt number ALB012310) filed by Ronald V. Santicola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Mailing Envelope)(mgh) Modified on 1/19/2022 (mgh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santicola v. Hunter-Tannersville Central School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald V. Santicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter-Tannersville Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Joseph Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice President Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senator Charles Schumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congresswoman Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of FBI Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Govenor Kathy Hochul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundar Pichal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?