Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holding, LLC and Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2022cv00180
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Norman A Mordue
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Granting #10 Letter Request. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effectuate service on defendant by 7/28/2022. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 5/27/2022. (kmc)
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Jacqueline M. James for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC requesting Extension of Time Within Which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant submitted to Judge Baxter . (James, Jacqueline)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, subject to the additional conditions set forth in Attachment "A." Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 3/14/2022. (kmc)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (James, Jacqueline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Granting #6 Plaintiff's Letter Request for permission to file a Motion seeking Leave to File a Third Party Subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) and adjourn without date an Initial Rule 16 Conference until the defendant in this action is named and served. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 3/9/2022.(kmc)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Jacqueline M. James for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC requesting Leave to File a Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Adjourn Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference submitted to Judge Baxter . (James, Jacqueline)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on March 3, 2022. (rep)
March 2, 2022 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 5/31/2022 11:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/24/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). Clerk mailed out report on 2/28/22 (gmd, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 24.194.182.14 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5818883) filed by Strike 3 Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd, )
February 28, 2022 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe defendant in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (gmd, )
February 28, 2022 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 5:21-cv-01079-NAM-ATB, 3:22-cv-00183-NAM-ATB, 1:21-cv-01222-NAM-ATB, 1:22-cv-00179-NAM-ATB (gmd, ) Modified on 2/28/2022 to edit related case #'s (gmd, ).
February 28, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY Notice of Potential Related Case for Judicial Review: Clerk edited the related case #'s to accurately reflect related cases. (gmd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holding, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?