Sontz v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: Joey Sontz
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00361
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
2 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby for all further proceedings. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 5/23/22. (ban)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Efile)(Barbour, Scott)
May 19, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Efile)(Barbour, Scott)
May 19, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 5/24/2022 (ztc, )
May 16, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on National Railroad Passenger Corporation on May 6, 2022, filed by Joey Sontz. (Darby, Perry)
May 16, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) answer due 5/27/2022. (ztc, )
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry M. Darby on behalf of Joey Sontz (Darby, Perry)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Perry Matthew Darby, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/29/2022. (tab)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Perry Matthew Darby SONTZ V AMTRAK Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5881627. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sponsor Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Registration, #3 Petition, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Santola, Daniel)
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION For Admission of Perry Matthew Darby to appear and practice Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff SONTZ V AMTRAK filed by Joey Sontz. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) New Attorney Registration, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Santola, Daniel)
April 20, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Complaint, Clerk inadvertently did not attach the unredacted version of the Complaint that counsel filed to docket entry # 1. Service has been regenerated. (ztc, )
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (ztc, )
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Joey Sontz; Attorney Matthew Darby, Esq., Email address is matt@darby-lawgroup.com. Phone number is 833-601-7245. Admissions due by 5/3/2022. (ztc, )
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 7/18/2022 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/11/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK). (ztc, )
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5875223) filed by Joey Sontz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sontz v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Sontz
Represented By: Amber L. Wright
Represented By: Daniel R. Santola
Represented By: Perry M. Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Scott A. Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?