Brown v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Susan Brown
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00394
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Department of Health & Human Services on 05/24/2022, filed by Susan Brown. (Szary, George)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Erin Morine, D.O. on 05/31/2022, filed by Susan Brown. (Szary, George)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint and Jury Demand, and Court Notice with General Order #25 served on U.S. Attorney General on 05/23/2022, filed by Susan Brown. (Szary, George)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for The United States of America answer due 7/22/2022. (egr)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint etc. served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 05/12/2022, filed by Susan Brown. (Szary, George)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The United States Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney's Office)(egr)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Susan Brown is requesting summons(es) be issued as to The United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Szary, George)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting [] Direct Assignment of this action to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart as it is deemed related to 1:20-cv-1137 (GTS/DJS). SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/28/2022. (sal)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/22/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The United States of America c/o Erin Morine, D.O, Hudson Headwaters Health Network(egr)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The United States of America (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5883627) filed by Susan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (egr)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:20-cv-1137. (egr)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Susan Brown NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: All Required Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Proposed Summons to be filed for US Attorney's Office and US Attorney General Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 5/2/2022 (egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Brown
Represented By: George J. Szary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?