Baker v. Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC
Plaintiff: Patricia Baker
Defendant: Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00563
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The request in stipulation #8 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant is directed to respond to the complaint by 8/8/2022. All other schedules and deadlines remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/11/2022. (jdp )
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond by Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC submitted to Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (Meola, Anthony)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony L. Meola, Jr on behalf of Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC (Meola, Anthony)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Baker. Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC served on 6/16/2022, answer due 7/7/2022. (Lekht, Eliezer)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patricia Baker. (Lekht, Eliezer)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference by Telephone set for 8/24/2022 at 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/17/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). {Copy mailed directly to U.S. Copyright Office - Register of Copyrights on 5/27/2022} (map)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC. (map)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED) against Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5918364) filed by Patricia Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certificate of Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2: Images of Copyright "Autumn Moonlight", #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Baker
Represented By: Eliezer Lekht
Represented By: Joseph Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canvas, Corks, and Forks, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Meola, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?