Ritch v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Destry Ritch
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00863
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 COURT NOTICE of Conference: The Initial Conference is now reset for 11/7/2022 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/31/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The conference will be conducted by telephone and counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call.(tab)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 letter-motion from CSX Transportation, Inc. requesting to withdraw the pending #4 motion for partial dismissal. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 10/14/2022. (sal)
October 13, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Rose, Andrew)
October 12, 2022 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Andrew C. Rose for CSX Transportation, Inc. requesting to Withdraw Pending Motion for Partial Dismissal (Dkt. 4) submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . (Rose, Andrew)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Destry Ritch.(Benz, David)
October 4, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on CSX Transportation, Inc. on September 1, 2022, filed by Destry Ritch. (Benz, David)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for November 17, 2022 at 9:00am and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion [The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's FSAA and LIA Claims filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. is returnable before Chief District Judge Brenda K. Sannes]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/26/2022. (tab)
September 22, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Rose, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's FSAA and LIA Claims filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Christian F. Hummel Response to Motion due by 10/13/2022. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss (LIA and FSAA Claims), #2 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Rose, Andrew)
August 22, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney David D. Nez, Esq.'s address and/or email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 8/25/2022 (map)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 9:00 AM in Albany before U.S. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/10/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc.. (map)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6006128) filed by Destry Ritch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritch v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destry Ritch
Represented By: David D. Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?