Cootware v. Scorpio Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Nichole Cootware
Defendant: Scorpio Motors, LLC doing business as Greenwich Ford
Case Number: 1:2022cv01149
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2615 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Scorpio Motors, LLC answer due 1/5/2023. (jel, )
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Dan Doe on 12/15/2022, filed by Nichole Cootware. (Davenport, Paul)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nichole Cootware re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (Davenport, Paul)
November 10, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Scorpio Motors, LLC answer due 12/1/2022. (mgh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/1/2023 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/25/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Scorpio Motors, LLC . (mgh)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Scorpio Motors, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6090155) filed by Nichole Cootware. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cootware v. Scorpio Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Cootware
Represented By: Paul E. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scorpio Motors, LLC doing business as Greenwich Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?