Fresina et al v. Casale Excavation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samuel Fresina, Anthony Fresina, Carmen Nicotera, Jr., Andrew Sciocchetti, John Cambell, Eugene Hallock and Laborers' Local Union No. 190
Defendant: Casale Excavation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01192
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Casale Excavation, Inc. answer due 12/14/2022. The Summons Returned Executed event at Docket 11 set an incorrect deadline of 1/23/2022. (ztc)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Hallock, Carmen Nicotera, Jr, Anthony Fresina, Samuel Fresina, Andrew Sciocchetti, Laborers' Local Union No. 190, John Cambell. Casale Excavation, Inc. served on 11/23/2022, answer due 1/23/2023. (Campora, Gregory)
November 15, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Casale Excavation, Inc. (hmr)
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Eugene Hallock, Carmen Nicotera, Jr, Anthony Fresina, Samuel Fresina, Andrew Sciocchetti, Laborers' Local Union No. 190, John Cambell is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Casale Excavation, Inc. (Campora, Gregory)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/14/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (amt)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:22-cv-09420. electronically transferred when case opened
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Andrew Sciocchetti, Samuel Fresina, John Cambell, Eugene Hallock, Anthony Fresina, Carmen Nicotera, Jr., Laborers' Local Union No. 190. ENDORSEMENT For the reasons set forth in the Court's November 7, 2022 Order to Show Cause and Plaintiffs' response thereto (Docs. 4, 5), the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court, Northern District of New York, without delay, and administratively close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/14/2022) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by John Cambell, Anthony Fresina, Samuel Fresina, Eugene Hallock, Laborers' Local Union No. 190, Carmen Nicotera, Jr, Andrew Sciocchetti..(Campora, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs show cause in writing on or before November 14, 2022, why this action should not be transferred to the Northern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/7/2022) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Cambell, Anthony Fresina, Samuel Fresina, Eugene Hallock, Laborers' Local Union No. 190, Carmen Nicotera, Jr, Andrew Sciocchetti. Document filed by John Cambell, Anthony Fresina, Samuel Fresina, Eugene Hallock, Laborers' Local Union No. 190, Carmen Nicotera, Jr, Andrew Sciocchetti..(Campora, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Campora, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Gregory S. Campora. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Laborers' Local 190 Pension Fund, Laborers' Local 190 Annuity Fund, Laborers' Local No. 190 Health Fund. The parties were added to the case in error. (pc) Modified on 11/4/2022 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory S. Campora. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrew Sciocchetti, Samuel Fresina, Carmen Nicotera, Jr,, Anthony Fresina, Eugene Hallock. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) Modified on 11/4/2022 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gregory S. Campora to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Casale Excavation, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26914382)Document filed by Eugene Hallock, Carmen Nicotera, Jr, Laborers' Local 190 Pension Fund, Laborers' Local No. 190 Health Fund, Anthony Fresina, Laborers' Local 190 Annuity Fund, Andrew Sciocchetti, Samuel Fresina, Laborers' Local Union No. 190, John Cambell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Campora, Gregory) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/14/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresina et al v. Casale Excavation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Fresina
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Fresina
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Nicotera, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Sciocchetti
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cambell
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Hallock
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Local Union No. 190
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casale Excavation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?