The Phoenix Insurance Company v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv01265
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
2 Judge: Anne M Nardacci
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Anne M Nardacci for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/18/2023. (khr)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER approving #6 Stipulation filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Answer due date updated for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 1/31/2023. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/27/2022. (tab)
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending time to respond by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company submitted to Judge Hon. Lawrence E. Kahn. (Potashner, Marshall)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on 12/9/2022, filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Messineo, Tariq)
December 12, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 12/30/2022. (khr)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Phoenix Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Phoenix Insurance Company.. (Messineo, Tariq)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2023 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/21/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (khr)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6112226) filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Phoenix Insurance Company v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Tariq J. Messineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?