CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company v. Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00067
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC.(Pickett, Patrick)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC.: Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC answer due 3/24/2023. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/14/2023. (tab)
March 10, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/31/2023 Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Pickett, Patrick)
March 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick J. Pickett on behalf of Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC (Pickett, Patrick)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark T. Mullen, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/21/2023. (tab)
February 17, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark T. Mullen Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6203654. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission, #3 Exhibit(s) Attorney Efiling registration & Oath of Admission, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Luccaro, Daniel)
February 16, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company. Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC served on 2/3/2023, answer due 2/24/2023. (Luccaro, Daniel)
January 20, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company regarding the #1 Complaint NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney address and/or email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 1/24/2023 (khr)
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/18/2023 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/11/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC. (khr)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6166337) filed by CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company v. Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Luccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firetek Sprinkler Systems, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?