Buckley et al v. Norlite, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Peter Buckley and Amy Buckley Harlow
Defendant: Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC and Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00334
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Anne M Nardacci
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 8 days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 6/26/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2023. Discovery due by 4/24/2024. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 1/25/2024. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 3/10/2024. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 3/25/2024. Motions to be filed by 5/24/2024. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 1/24/2024. Status Report due by 1/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/10/2023. (tab)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 6/7/2023. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 1/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/10/2023. (tab) (Main Document 17 replaced on 5/10/2023) (tab, ).
May 8, 2023 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/8/2023 by telephone. [10:00am-10:10am] Appearances by Philip Oswald, Esq. for plaintiff; James Patrick Ray, Esq. for the defendants. Pretrial deadlines are established and a Uniform Pre-trial Scheduling Order will be issued. (tab)
May 3, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16, Initial Conference in this matter, is set for 5/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel are directed to DIAL IN @ 518-217-2288 and use Conference ID 119 086 447 # to connect to the conference call. (tab)
April 27, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC.(Ray, James)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion from James P. Ray for Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC requesting extension of time to respond to complaint: The answer deadline is extended to 4/27/2023 for defendants. The Initial Conference is also reset for Monday, 5/8/2023 @ 10:00 AM. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The Court will issue a separate notice setting forth the instructions to connect to the conference call in advance of the scheduled date and time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/17/2023. (tab)
April 17, 2023 Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Peter Buckley, Amy Buckley Harlow. (Oswald, Phillip)
April 12, 2023 Filing 12 Letter Motion from James P. Ray for Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC requesting extension of time to respond to complaint submitted to Judge Judge Anne M. Nardacci and Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Ray, James)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion from James P. Ray for Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC requesting extension of time to respond to complaint: Answer deadline is extended and is now due by 4/13/2023. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/21/2023. (tab)
March 20, 2023 Filing 10 Letter Motion from James P. Ray for Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC requesting extension of time to respond to complaint submitted to Judge Anne M. Nardacci and Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Ray, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC re #7 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, (Ray, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC. (Ray, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC. (Ray, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Norlite, LLC. (Ray, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norlite, LLC, Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Ray, James)
March 15, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aurora Heller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Heller, Aurora)
March 15, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/24/2023 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/17/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
March 15, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Peter Buckley, Amy Buckley Harlow regarding the #2 State Court Complaint and #4 Notice of Appearance NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney address and/or email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Specifically with Attorneys Phillip A. Oswald and Aurora Heller, their account lists their email addresses as oswald@RuppPfalzgraf.com for Phillip Oswald and heller@ruppbaase.com for Aurora Heller. The email addresses appear to be different than what is located on their State Court documents and the notice of appearance filed with District Court on this date. Both accounts also list both attorneys at Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham LLC. If incorrect firm name, please update. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 3/20/2023. {Mailed to both Phillip Oswald and Aurora Heller on 3/15/2023} (see)
March 15, 2023 ***Answer due date updated for Norlite, LLC answer due 3/21/2023; Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC answer due 3/21/2023; Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC answer due 3/21/2023. (see)
March 14, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff(s) in New York State Supreme Court, Albany County. (see)
March 14, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Albany County, case number 901104-23 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6230501) filed by Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC, and Norlite, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley et al v. Norlite, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Buckley
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Represented By: Aurora Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Buckley Harlow
Represented By: Phillip A. Oswald
Represented By: Aurora Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norlite, LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Ray
Represented By: Wystan M Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Ray
Represented By: Wystan M Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradebe Treatment and Recycling Northeast, LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Ray
Represented By: Wystan M Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?