Burns v. Volvo Cars USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Burns
Defendant: Volvo Cars USA, LLC and McGovern Volvo Cars Albany
Case Number: 1:2024cv00560
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Anne M Nardacci
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by McGovern Volvo Cars Albany.(Cerussi, Thomas)
June 17, 2024 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Volvo Cars USA, LLC. (Povelones, Arthur)
June 17, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Volvo Cars USA, LLC.(Povelones, Arthur)
June 17, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur A. Povelones, Jr on behalf of Volvo Cars USA, LLC (Povelones, Arthur)
June 15, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeffrey Burns.(Arleo, Robert)
June 12, 2024 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McGovern Volvo Cars Albany. (Cerussi, Thomas)
June 12, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by McGovern Volvo Cars Albany.(Cerussi, Thomas)
May 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas F. Cerussi on behalf of McGovern Volvo Cars Albany (Cerussi, Thomas)
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Burns. Volvo Cars USA, LLC served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/29/2024. (Arleo, Robert)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Volvo Cars USA, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Summons Issued as to McGovern Volvo Cars Albany) (kck)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Jeffrey Burns is requesting summons(es) be issued as to McGovern Volvo Cars Albany, Volvo Cars USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Arleo, Robert)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 7/22/2024 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/15/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kck)
April 23, 2024 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY: NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summonses were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summonses on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 4/26/2024 (kck)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Volvo Cars USA, LLC and McGovern Volvo Cars Albany (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6705562) filed by Jeffrey Burns. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Volvo Cars USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Burns
Represented By: Robert L. Arleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Cars USA, LLC
Represented By: Arthur A. Povelones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGovern Volvo Cars Albany
Represented By: Thomas F. Cerussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?