Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2024cv00584
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mitchell J Katz
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Jacqueline M. James for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC requesting Extension of Time Within Which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant submitted to Judge Katz . (James, Jacqueline)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #9 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, subject to the additional conditions set forth in Attachment "A." Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 6/4/2024. (ztc)
May 30, 2024 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #9 Motion for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stalzer, #2 Declaration Declaration of Williamson, #3 Declaration Declaration of Paige)(James, Jacqueline)
May 30, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order) Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (James, Jacqueline)
May 30, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Third Party Early Discovery (James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Granting #6 Motion requesting leave to file a motion seeking leave to file a third-party subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) and adjourning any scheduled Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 5/23/2024. (ztc)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/7/2024 Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (James, Jacqueline)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 5/1/2024. (nmk)
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (hmr)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) (hmr)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Conference Date and Time to be Determined. (hmr)
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT with Jury Demand against John Doe (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6714093) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)
April 30, 2024 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:24-CV-0142, 1:24-CV-0148, etc. (hmr)
April 30, 2024 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe defendant(s) in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe defendant(s) at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe defendant(s), plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant(s) pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?