Nunez Sanchez et al v. Bavarian Mansion, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rosendo Nunez and Alejandro Nunez Sanchez
Defendant: Five Furlongs Tavern LLC doing business as Five Furlongs Tavern LLC, Bavarian Mansion, LLC doing business as Bavarian Manor Country Inn & Restaurant and Garrett Doyle
Case Number: 1:2024cv00693
Filed: May 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alejandro Nunez Sanchez, Rosendo Nunez. Garrett Doyle served on 7/11/2024, answer due 8/1/2024. (Lee, C.K.)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alejandro Nunez Sanchez, Rosendo Nunez. Bavarian Mansion, LLC served on 6/3/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Lee, C.K.)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alejandro Nunez Sanchez, Rosendo Nunez. Five Furlongs Tavern LLC served on 6/3/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Lee, C.K.)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Rosendo Nunez (Consent to sue under the F.L.S.A.) (Lee, C.K.)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Alejandro Nunez Sanchez (Consent to sue under the F.L.S.A.) (Lee, C.K.)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/13/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bavarian Mansion, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Five Furlongs Tavern LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Garrett Doyle)(egr)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bavarian Mansion, LLC, Garrett Doyle, Five Furlongs Tavern LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6740022) filed by Alejandro Nunez Sanchez, Rosendo Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez Sanchez et al v. Bavarian Mansion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Furlongs Tavern LLC doing business as Five Furlongs Tavern LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bavarian Mansion, LLC doing business as Bavarian Manor Country Inn & Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosendo Nunez
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Nunez Sanchez
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?