Mahan et al v. County of Saratoga
Plaintiff: Andrea Dycha, Jenae Heflin, Daniel Breda, Niklas Kaplan, Michael Bedell, Michael Grigas, Pedro Garcia, Mason Fountain, Michael Martin, Kevin Ferris, William Kitts, Chad Marshall, Clayton Brownell, Christopher Kyne, Jeffrey Margan, Hayden Chapman, James Labounty, Ryan Mahan, Christopher Greive, Christopher Clayton, Jayme Benoit, Eddie Hernandez, Kassandra Heflin, Scott Carpenter, Jr, Sean Lyons, William Maynard, II, Jakob McCasland, Connor McCrea, Eric Mueller, John Murphy, IV, Mark Nelson, Ethan Ostapczuk, Thomas Phelan, Gary Pitcheralle, Anthony Praga, Ramon Rodriguez, Alexander Roney, Kyle Rossi, Tyler Ruhle, Crien Salton, Michael Sharadin, Robert Swatling, Adam Towers, Jason Urdang, Nicole Voegler, Kimberly Whitacre, Michael Whitacre, Daniel Yetto, David Zecca, Joshua Edmunds and Aaron Hinman
Defendant: County of Saratoga
Case Number: 1:2024cv00880
Filed: July 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE by Joshua Edmunds, Aaron Hinman Notice of Filing Opt-In Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- Consents)(McGillivary, Gregory)
August 7, 2024 Filing 14 Defendant's Answer ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by County of Saratoga.(Wright, John)
July 23, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Lerner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lerner, Rachel)
July 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory K. McGillivary on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGillivary, Gregory)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Beth Lite, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/22/2024. (tab)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Keith McGillivary, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/22/2024. (tab)
July 19, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Ann Flowers-Stitt (Authorized Agent) on 7/18/2024, filed by Michael Bedell, Jayme Benoit, Daniel Breda, Clayton Brownell, Scott Carpenter, Jr, Hayden Chapman, Christopher Clayton, Andrea Dycha, Kevin Ferris, Mason Fountain, Pedro Garcia, Christopher Greive, Michael Grigas, Jenae Heflin, Kassandra Heflin, Eddie Hernandez, Niklas Kaplan, William Kitts, Christopher Kyne, James Labounty, Sean Lyons, Ryan Mahan, Jeffrey Margan, Chad Marshall, Michael Martin, William Maynard, II, Jakob McCasland, Connor McCrea, Eric Mueller, John Murphy, IV, Mark Nelson, Ethan Ostapczuk, Thomas Phelan, Gary Pitcheralle, Anthony Praga, Ramon Rodriguez, Alexander Roney, Kyle Rossi, Tyler Ruhle, Crien Salton, Michael Sharadin, Robert Swatling, Adam Towers, Jason Urdang, Nicole Voegler, Kimberly Whitacre, Michael Whitacre, Daniel Yetto, David Zecca. (Block, Sarah)
July 19, 2024 ***Answer due date updated for County of Saratoga answer due 8/8/2024. (see)
July 17, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Beth Lite Lerner Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6802087. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EFiling Request Form, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Exhibit(s) Attorney Admission Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Block, Sarah)
July 17, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Keith McGillivary Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6802076. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EFiling Request Form, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Exhibit(s) Attorney Admission Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit(s) Virginia Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Exhibit(s) Washington Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Block, Sarah)
July 17, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to County of Saratoga. (kck)
July 17, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Adam Towers, Jeffrey Margan, Crien Salton, Chad Marshall, Michael Whitacre, Michael Bedell, Ryan Mahan, Kimberly Whitacre, John Murphy, IV, Clayton Brownell, Gary Pitcheralle, Connor McCrea, Niklas Kaplan, Christopher Clayton, Andrea Dycha, Christopher Greive, James Labounty, Tyler Ruhle, Kyle Rossi, Alexander Roney, Anthony Praga, David Zecca, Kassandra Heflin, Jayme Benoit, Kevin Ferris, Robert Swatling, Jason Urdang, Daniel Yetto, Mark Nelson, Michael Sharadin, Jakob McCasland, Hayden Chapman, Ramon Rodriguez, Jenae Heflin, Daniel Breda, Nicole Voegler, Eric Mueller, Sean Lyons, Thomas Phelan, Ethan Ostapczuk, Christopher Kyne, Eddie Hernandez, William Kitts, Mason Fountain, Pedro Garcia, Michael Martin, Michael Grigas, Scott Carpenter, Jr, William Maynard, II is requesting summons(es) be issued as to All Defendants (Block, Sarah)
July 16, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (kck)
July 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Plaintiffs; Attorneys Gregory K. McGillivary, Esq. and Rachel Lerner, Esq. Email addresses are gkm@mselaborlaw.com and rbl@mselaborlaw.com. Phone number is (202) 833-8855. Admissions due by 7/30/2024. {Copy served on Attorneys with copy of GO #25 via email} (kck)
July 16, 2024 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 10/15/2024 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/8/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kck)
July 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against County of Saratoga (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6800688) filed by Ryan Mahan, William Kitts, Michael Bedell, Jayme Benoit, Daniel Breda, Clayton Brownell, Scott Carpenter, Jr, Hayden Chapman, Christopher Clayton, Andrea Dycha, Kevin Ferris, Mason Fountain, Pedro Garcia, Christopher Greive, Michael Grigas, Jenae Heflin, Kassandra Heflin, Eddie Hernandez, Niklas Kaplan, Christopher Kyne, James Labounty, Sean Lyons, Jeffrey Margan, Chad Marshall, Michael Martin, William Maynard, II, Jakob McCasland, Connor McCrea, Eric Mueller, John Murphy, IV, Mark Nelson, Ethan Ostapczuk, Thomas Phelan, Gary Pitcheralle, Anthony Praga, Ramon Rodriguez, Alexander Roney, Kyle Rossi, Tyler Ruhle, Crien Salton, Michael Sharadin, Robert Swatling, Adam Towers, Jason Urdang, Nicole Voegler, Kimberly Whitacre, Michael Whitacre, Daniel Yetto and David Zecca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kck) Modified on 7/16/2024 by Clerk to note Jury Demand (kck).
July 16, 2024 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney Howard Wien's address and/or email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/19/2024 (kck)
July 16, 2024 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/19/2024 (kck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahan et al v. County of Saratoga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Dycha
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenae Heflin
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Breda
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niklas Kaplan
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bedell
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grigas
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Garcia
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Fountain
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martin
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ferris
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kitts
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Marshall
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Brownell
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kyne
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Margan
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayden Chapman
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Labounty
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Mahan
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Greive
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Clayton
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Benoit
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Hernandez
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassandra Heflin
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Carpenter, Jr
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Lyons
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Maynard, II
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jakob McCasland
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor McCrea
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Mueller
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Murphy, IV
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nelson
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Ostapczuk
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Phelan
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Pitcheralle
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Praga
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Rodriguez
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Roney
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Rossi
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Ruhle
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crien Salton
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sharadin
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Swatling
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Towers
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Urdang
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Voegler
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Whitacre
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Whitacre
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Yetto
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Zecca
Represented By: Sarah M. Block
Represented By: Howard G. Wien
Represented By: Rachel Lerner
Represented By: Gregory K. McGillivary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Edmunds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Hinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Saratoga
Represented By: John D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?