Lozada v. Haitech Works LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Alfonso Campos Lozada
Defendant: Haitech Works LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01041
Filed: August 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Anne M Nardacci
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Haitech Works LLC, on 08/28/2024, filed by Brandon Alfonso Campos Lozada. (Schlade, Daniel)
October 15, 2024 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Haitech Works LLC. (ztc)
October 14, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Haitech Works LLC by Brandon Alfonso Campos Lozada. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment)(Schlade, Daniel)
October 11, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Haitech Works LLC on 8/28/2024, filed by Brandon Alfonso Campos Lozada. (Schlade, Daniel)
August 26, 2024 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 11/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/18/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc)
August 26, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Haitech Works LLC. (ztc)
August 23, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Schlade on behalf of Brandon Alfonso Campos Lozada. (ztc)
August 23, 2024 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Haitech Works LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6846574) filed by Brandon Alfonso Campos Lozada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lozada v. Haitech Works LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Alfonso Campos Lozada
Represented By: Daniel Schlade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haitech Works LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?