Claros et al v. Marvin's Refrigeration Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Damaris Munoz and Mauricio Claros
Defendant: Marvin's Refrigeration Corp., Marvin Trejos and Grely Moreno Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2024cv01197
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Letter Request to adjourn and reset the Initial Conference. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/3/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The Initial Conference is reset for 2/10/2025 @ 10:00 AM. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The Court will issue a separate notice setting forth the instructions to connect to the conference call in advance of the scheduled date and time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/7/2024. (tab)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER approving #8 Stipulation filed by Marvin Trejos, Grely Moreno Gonzalez, Marvin's Refrigeration Corp. to extend answer deadline. Answer due date updated for Marvin's Refrigeration Corp. answer due 12/16/2024; Grely Moreno Gonzalez answer due 12/16/2024; Marvin Trejos answer due 12/16/2024. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/7/2024. (tab)
November 1, 2024 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Judith Swartz for Marvin's Refrigeration Corp., Grely Moreno Gonzalez, Marvin Trejos requesting extension of deadline for parties to submit Case Management Plan and deadline for initial conference submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Swartz, Judith)
November 1, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Marvin's Refrigeration Corp., Grely Moreno Gonzalez, Marvin Trejos submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and Judge Christian F. Hummel. (Swartz, Judith)
November 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith L. Swartz on behalf of All Defendants (Swartz, Judith)
October 3, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Marvin's Refrigeration Corp., Grely Moreno Gonzalez, and Marvin Trejos. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Marvin Trejos, #2 Summons issued as to Grely Moreno Gonzalez)(tll)
October 3, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Damaris Munoz, Mauricio Claros is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Grely Moreno Gonzalez re: #1 Complaint,. (Hussain, Maureen)
October 3, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Damaris Munoz, Mauricio Claros is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Marvin Trejos re: #1 Complaint,. (Hussain, Maureen)
October 3, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Damaris Munoz, Mauricio Claros is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Marvin's Refrigeration Corp. re: #1 Complaint,. (Hussain, Maureen)
September 30, 2024 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/30/2024 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/23/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (tll)
September 30, 2024 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint,. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 10/3/2024 (tll)
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Marvin's Refrigeration Corp., Marvin Trejos, and Grely Moreno Gonzalez (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6883441) filed by Mauricio Claros and Damaris Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claros et al v. Marvin's Refrigeration Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin's Refrigeration Corp.
Represented By: Judith L. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Trejos
Represented By: Judith L. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grely Moreno Gonzalez
Represented By: Judith L. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damaris Munoz
Represented By: Maureen Hussain
Represented By: Cristina Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Claros
Represented By: Maureen Hussain
Represented By: Cristina Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?