Town of Blooming Grove, New York v. Mahar et al
Petitioner: Town of Blooming Grove, New York
Respondent: Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, Keen Equities, LLC, Clovewood Transportation Corporation, Village of South Blooming Grove, New York, Keen Transportation Corporation and Dvrei Chaim Transportation Corporation
Case Number: 1:2025cv00088
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Brindisi
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1452 R&R re motions to remand (non-core)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2025 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: granting the #20 Letter requesting an extension of time to respond to pending motions. Responses to the pending #12 and #13 Motions to Remand shall be filed by 3/18/2025. Any replies are due by 4/1/2025. SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Anthony J. Brindisi on 2/25/2025. (nmk)
February 24, 2025 Filing 20 Letter Motion from John J. Henry for Keen Equities, LLC, Clovewood Transportation Corporation, Keen Transportation Corporation, Dvrei Chaim Transportation Corporation requesting an extension of time to respond to pending motions, with a concomitant extension of the Town's and DEC's time to file reply papers submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Henry, John)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER : Court reviewed letter request (Dkt. No. #18 ) from the Keen defendants-respondents seeking an extension of time for all defendants-respondents to respond to the petition and complaint which is granted as follows for the reasons stated. The time for ALL defendants-respondents to respond to the petition and complaint is held in abeyance at this time and will be reset as necessary after a decision is issued on the pending motions to remand filed at Dkt. Nos. #12 and #13 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/18/2025. (sg)
February 14, 2025 Filing 18 Joint Letter Motion from Robert S. Rosborough IV for Keen Equities, LLC, Clovewood Transportation Corporation, Keen Transportation Corporation, Dvrei Chaim Transportation Corporation requesting Adjournment of Time to Respond to Complaint on Behalf of All Defendants submitted to Judge Hon. Thrse Wiley Dancks . (Rosborough, Robert)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER : Court reviewed letter request (Dkt. No. #15 ) from defendants NYS DEC and Mahar seeking an extension of time to respond to the complaint which is granted as follows for the reasons stated. The time for defendants NYS DEC and Mahar to respond to the complaint is held in abeyance at this time and will be reset as necessary after a decision is issued on the pending motions to remand filed at Dkt. Nos. #12 and #13 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/14/2025. (sg)
February 13, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Norah M. Murphy on behalf of Village of South Blooming Grove, New York (Murphy, Norah)
February 13, 2025 Filing 15 Letter Motion from Joshua M. Tallent for Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation requesting adjournment of answer date submitted to Judge Dancks . (Tallent, Joshua)
February 12, 2025 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation. Declaration filed by Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation. (Tallent, Joshua)
February 7, 2025 Filing 13 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Albany County filed by Town of Blooming Grove, New York. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Anthony J. Brindisi Response to Motion due by 2/28/2025. Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/7/2025 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of B Nugent, #2 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law in support) (Nugent, Brian)
February 7, 2025 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation regarding the #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation.. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Other Deficiency - The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. PLEASE NOTE THAT THIS FILING IS NOT COMPLIANT WITH LOCAL RULE 7.1 SINCE THE SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT IS MISSING - Please file the supporting affidavit and link it to #12 Motion to Remand. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 2/12/2025 (hmr)
February 4, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation. Response to Motion due by 2/25/2025. Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/4/2025 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Tallent, Joshua)
February 3, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian D. Nugent on behalf of Town of Blooming Grove, New York (Nugent, Brian)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed the letter request (Dkt. No. #9 ) of respondents-defendants Keen Equities, LLC, Clovewood Transportation Corporation, Keen Transportation Corporation, and Dvrei Chaim Transportation Corporation ("Keen Respondents") for an extension of time to respond to the petition/complaint which is granted for the reasons stated. Keen Respondents shall respond to the petition/complaint by 2/14/2025. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/23/2025. (sg)
January 23, 2025 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Robert S. Rosborough IV for Keen Equities, LLC, Clovewood Transportation Corporation, Keen Transportation Corporation, Dvrei Chaim Transportation Corporation requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Petition submitted to Judge Hon. Thrse Wiley Dancks . (Rosborough, Robert)
January 23, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert S. Rosborough, IV on behalf of Keen Equities, LLC, Clovewood Transportation Corporation, Keen Transportation Corporation, Dvrei Chaim Transportation Corporation (Rosborough, Robert)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER : Court reviewed state respondents'-defendants' letter request (Dkt. No. #6 ) for an extension of time to respond to the petition/complaint which is granted for the reasons stated. Respondents-defendants Mahar and NYSDEC shall respond to the petition/complaint by 2/14/2025. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/22/2025. (sg)
January 22, 2025 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Joshua M. Tallent for Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation requesting extension of time to answer submitted to Judge Dancks . (Tallent, Joshua)
January 21, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Tallent on behalf of Sean Mahar, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation (Tallent, Joshua)
January 16, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Town of Blooming Grove, New York; Attorney Brian D. Nugent, Email address is bnugent@fnmlawfirm.com. Phone number is (845) 353-2000. Admissions due by 1/30/2025. {Mailed to attorney on 1/21/2025}(see)
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Keen Equities, LLC; Attorney Kevin J. Nash. Phone number is (212) 221-5700. Admissions due by 1/30/2025. {Mailed to attorney on 1/17/2025}(see)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 STATE COURT VERIFIED PETITION AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff(s) in New York State Supreme Court, Albany County. (see)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Albany County, case number 912403-24 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6997208) filed by Keen Equities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit(s) A - U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York Order Confirming Amended Chapter 11 Plan, #3 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Verified Petition and Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Blooming Grove, New York v. Mahar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Town of Blooming Grove, New York
Represented By: Brian D. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sean Mahar
Represented By: Joshua Tallent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New York State Department of Environmental Conservation
Represented By: Joshua Tallent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keen Equities, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Represented By: John J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clovewood Transportation Corporation
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Represented By: John J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Village of South Blooming Grove, New York
Represented By: Norah M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keen Transportation Corporation
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Represented By: John J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dvrei Chaim Transportation Corporation
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Represented By: John J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?