Sweet v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roy Sweet
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust and Does 1-10, Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2025cv00320
Filed: March 11, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul J Evangelista
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act (RESPA)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Joseph N. Froehlich for Fay Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint submitted to Judge Hon. Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. . (Froehlich, Joseph)
March 14, 2025 ***Answer due date updated for Fay Servicing, LLC answer due 3/18/2025; U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust answer due 3/18/2025. (egr)
March 12, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Roy Sweet; Attorney Amit Deshmukh, Esq., Email address is amitdeshmukh@desh-law.com. Phone number is 862-213-4960. Copy of Notice and of General Order 25 were emailed to counsel. Admissions due by 3/26/2025. (egr)
March 12, 2025 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/29/2025 at 9:30 AM in Albany before U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/22/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
March 11, 2025 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in NYS Supreme Court: County of Fulton. (egr)
March 11, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court: County of Fulton, case number EF2024-11993 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7057736) filed by Fay Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust. (#1 Exhibit 1: State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweet v. Fay Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Joseph N. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Joseph N. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?