Ferreira v. City of Binghamton et al
Plaintiff: |
Jesus Ferreira |
Defendant: |
City of Binghamton, Binghamton Police Department, Joseph Zikuski and John Does 1 thru 10 |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00107 |
Filed: |
January 29, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Binghamton Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew T. Baxter |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas J. McAvoy |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 27, 2017 |
Filing
204
DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the Plaintiff's motion for judgment as a matter of law or, in the alternative, a new trial, dkt. # 175 , is hereby DENIED. The Defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law, dkt. # [1 74], is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to enter final judgment for the Defendant City of Binghamton and Binghamton Police Department on all claims raised in the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 9/27/2017. (mc)
|
September 16, 2016 |
Filing
157
ORDER Granting in part / Denying in part / Reserving in part Defts City/Binghamton & Miller's 101 Motion in Limine; and, DENYING Pltf's 102 Motion in Limine to preclude testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Lyness; and, RESERVING Pltf's 103 Motion in Limine to preclude certain medical record information; and, Granting in part / Denying in part / Reserving in part Pltf's 104 3rd Motion in Limine; Signed by Sr. District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy dtd 9/16/2016 (cml)
|
June 2, 2016 |
Filing
98
ORDER GRANTING IN PART / DENYING IN PART Defts Binghamton Police Dept. & City/ Binghamton's 86 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Pltf's claims of false arrest at the scene of the search, violation of 8th Amendment, malicious prosecuti on, violation of 1983 equal protection/Section 1981 due process claims, Monell claims against the City/Binghamton, ADA claims, state law claims for negligent hiring & supervision, state law claims for delay & obstruction of medical care, claims again st the City/Binghamton Police Dept., and, punitive damages against the City/Binghamton are DISMISSED. The Court further DENIES the defendants' motion to preclude testimony of plaintiff's rebuttal witness forensic pathologist, Dr. Scott F. LaPoint w/ leave to renew. The defendants' 86 motion is DENIED in all other respects; Signed by Sr. District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy dtd 6/01/2016 (cml)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?