LeChase Construction Services, LLC. v. Escobar Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: LeChase Construction Services, LLC.
Defendant: Escobar Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01021
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David E Peebles
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LeChase Construction Services, LLC.. Escobar Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Dreste, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/30/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Escobar Construction, Inc. (rep)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Against Escobar Construction, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4489226), filed by LeChase Construction Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pertinent Portion of Subcontract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeChase Construction Services, LLC. v. Escobar Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escobar Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeChase Construction Services, LLC.
Represented By: John W. Dreste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?