United States of America Acting Through Farmers Home Adminstration, United States Department of Agriculture v. Estate of Karen E. Davis et al
Plaintiff: United States of America Acting Through Farmers home Adminstration, United States Department of Agriculture
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services LLC, Estate of Karen E. Davis, John W Davis, Jane Doe #1-5, Limestone Ridge, LLC and John Doe #1-5
Case Number: 3:2018cv01075
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David E Peebles
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for John W Davis answer due 11/5/2018; Estate of Karen E. Davis answer due 11/5/2018. (khr)
November 4, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on mortgaged premises; "John Doe" and "Jane Doe" 1-5 on 10/3/2018, filed by United States of America Acting Through Farmers Home Adminstration, United States Department of Agriculture. (Manfredi, John)
November 4, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Estate of Karen E. Davis on 10/15/2018, filed by United States of America Acting Through Farmers Home Adminstration, United States Department of Agriculture. (Manfredi, John)
November 4, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on John W. Davis a/k/a John W. Davis Jr. on 10/15/2018, filed by United States of America Acting Through Farmers Home Adminstration, United States Department of Agriculture. (Manfredi, John)
September 12, 2018 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" or "Jane Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" and "Jane Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (jdp, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Arrow Financial Services LLC, John W Davis, Estate of Karen E. Davis, Limestone Ridge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jdp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2018: #3 Summons) (jdp, ).
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arrow Financial Services LLC, John W Davis, Jane Doe #1-5, John Doe #1-5, Estate of Karen E. Davis, Limestone Ridge, LLC filed by United States of America Acting Through Farmers Home Adminstration, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America Acting Through Farmers Home Adminstration, United States Department of Agriculture v. Estate of Karen E. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Karen E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limestone Ridge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America Acting Through Farmers home Adminstration, United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: John S. Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?