Ivester v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Tina Ivester
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv01103
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
0 Judge: David E Peebles
1 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:18-cv-14411, filed 09/28/2018. (plp)
September 28, 2018 5 Case transferred electronically to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. (plp)
September 28, 2018 4 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #108. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
September 24, 2018 3 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS to the Multidistrict Panel filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (jdp, )
September 14, 2018 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/21/2018 11:30 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/14/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, )
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4507248) filed by Tina Ivester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivester v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Ivester
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?