Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. County of Delaware, NY
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Defendant: County of Delaware, NY
Case Number: 3:2018cv01111
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David E Peebles
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Affidavit of Mailing by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Missick, Jacqueline)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Missick, Jacqueline)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Missick, Jacqueline)
September 20, 2018 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The clerk modified the docket text of the #1 Complaint to reflect that it was filed on September 14, 2018. The clerk inadvertently docketed it as filed on September 20,2018. (rep)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 12:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/14/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to County of Delaware, NY. (rep)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Against County of Delaware, NY (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4508596), filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C, #2 Civil Coversheet)(rep) Modified on 9/20/2018 - to correct the filing date (rep).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. County of Delaware, NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Delaware, NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Missick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?