Hicks et al v. T.L. Cannon Management Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Emily Steitz, Danielle Bennett, Amanda Blesinger, Savannah Hempstead, Courtney Andersen, Felicia Townsend, Joseph Crane, Jacquelyn Moore, Colleen Ehrgott, Jessica Bonaventura, Vanessa Coutant, Denise Nies, Hannah Biehn, Rachel Pullano, Dawn Hayes, Falesha Mechanick, Julie Salisbury, Jessica Zapf, Ericka Acquilano, Meaghan Hillery, Halley Collister, Joseph Milligan, Hannah Dillenburg, Rachael Paradis, Melissa Dickman, Brianna Smith, James Frasier, Jr., Christian LaValle, Kathryn Wagner, Sabrina Noel, Brittney Driscoll, Janine Tompkins, Lisa Percopo, Evan Phillips, Brittney Gagnon, Samantha Harris, Emily Bryan, Teresa Olivapotenza, Keli Locker, Gregory Cook, Panida Promnoi, Nadie Phoenix, Lisa Fitzgerald, Crystal Dawn Moreno, Tracy Daniels, Lisa McCarthy, Amanda Damian, David Alvarado, Tiffany Yerico, Kimberly Taylor, Yavonna McMorris, Kayla Snyder Hayes, Tresea Snyder, Caitlin Guido, John Speta, Courtney Berg, Angela Wayman, Kimberly Gates, Meghan Olney, Jaclyn Blackmer, Christina Socci, Carrie Young, Gilda Bermudez, Ashley Giles, Maria Boylan, Else Davis, Morgan McHale, Gina Mirando, Brandy Selover, Lindsay Malek, Eva LaFlesh, Rebecca Ortiz, Mallory Udick, Janett Vega, Maura Kinney-Palix, Chelsea Zakowski, Marilyn Carkner, Joshua Montanaro, Nickcole Miller, Stacy Culver, Jonathan Kelleher, Amy Batza, Rebecca Bugarin, Edward Keeley, Danielle Parker, Brianna Caldwell, Elizabeth Perkins, Alyssa O'Bryan, Desiree Tesoriero, Ashton Battaglia, Luke Manley, Xavier Velez, Angela Kondracki, Roodley Preval, Lindsey Murdoch, Timothy Vaughn, Hannah Yurksaitis, Katie Stites, Amanda McLane, Margaret Infantino, Catherine Flint, Kristin Raymond, Stacey Colleen Gale, Georgina Mitchell, Omar Acevedo, Donna Deters, Jordan Olinsky, Siobhan Cherry, Krista Huey, Sofia Sainz, Hannah Edlen, Kenneth Heppner, Jessica Rochelle, Dawn Mas, Lisamarie Murphy, Amanda Burgio, Lindsay Moss, Donna Nupp, Lacey Geis, Kristen Groover, Jamie Yates, Kaylea Hayden, Victoria Jones, Jaina Urbanski, Mary Slater, Brandi Anderson, Samuel Carty, Amie Nix, Ashley Palumbo, Brittany Davis, Nicole Englert, Julie Moore, Cassandra Copes, Stephen Light, Sadie Breen, Estelle Kreps, Melissa Mauriello, Justin Love, Nicole Nowatzki, Shawna Mariano, Amy Sherwood, Kelsie Adams, Shaun Light, Beth Reding, Julia Fanghella, Nathan LaMattina, Sarah Milograno, Alyssa Hutton, Joseph Gegeny, Brandi-Lyn Heidenreich, Jessica Coons, Shannon Hurchla, Michelle Moller, Nichole Potter, Ashleigh Fobare, Mariah Reploeg-Fitzgerald, Ashley Liguori, Steven Reid, Amanda Werner, Amanda Collier, Amy Mclaren, Emily Wallace, Jeremy Evans, Nicholas Maenza, Mary Brooks, Liza LaLomia, Marie Baker, Carli Teats, Angela Krezmer, Eric Vogel, Misty Hofert, Sharon Veronick, Emily Coppenrath, Devin Neuwirth, Alyssa Sharrow, Amber M Smith, Doris Caskey, Kara Morris, Clarissa Beadles, Samantha Alessandra, Jennifer Wilson, Maria Burghezi, Thomas VanBuren, Kelsey Schuhle, Tyler Nielsen, Jessica Gardner, Rachel Kiehlmeier, Margaret Savino, Kelley Foster, Melissa Wilk, Katie Rukus, Casey Rulison, Robyn King, Colleen Osborne, Tara Werner, Carrie Rosenzweig, Stephanie Cappello, Jill Cooper, Megan He, Kimberly Stetson-Gelinas, Cassandra Anello, Katherine Pinkowski, Deborah Gueth, Alisa Brophy, Scott Barr, Deidra Cross, Matthew McDaniels, Caitlin Bimont, Loni Buckholz, Jamie Woods, John Gizzarelli, Tammie Creary, Catherine Leonardi, Lana Dube, Thomas Mills, Rodney Bennett, James Joseph, Lara Frazee, Meaghan Hogan, Dominick Scafidi, Marchietta Green, Nicole Jerard, Kristina Moller, Joseph Smith, Pamela Postlewait, Lauren Edwards, Courtney Richards, Erica Perkins, Carmen Nichols, Jamie Bemis, Addison Marino, Arlene Gray, Justin Wray, Narseary Johnson, Tonya Fry, Kelly Kulik, Jessica Baker, James Lenga, Tracy Kearney, Rebecca Holt, Ashley Blackwell, Jessica Dobucki, Donielle Bates, Patricia Voorhees, Robin Powers, Brendan Ference, Shauna Weber, Sharifa Whitt, Alison Lorenc, Tracy Donovan, Danielle McDonald, Alexandra Soper, Brooke Burnside, Sacha Vega, Sean Francis, Chelsea Kanaval, Lorraine Butler, Bianca Decker, Teresa Congiusti, Kaitlyn French, Jack Upton, Arica Gessi, Jennifer Coombs, Ashley Stafford, Jennifer Arcuri, Jenna Renouf, Ashley Carley, Casey Schmidt, Samantha Keener Kasulis, Jamie Shaughnessy, DeMarquis Williams, Erika Koestle, Carrie Morris, Michelle Eason, Victoria Brown, Amanda Boushee, Shayona Lewis, Kasandra Knapp, Bianca Valentino, Laura Zipprich, Samantha Klewicki, Christina Bedir, Allison Myers, Meghan Tuma, Alyssa Morris, Lauri Soos, Con-Jo Harris, Melissa Hartwig, Stacey McLeer, Tabitha Walker, Crystal First-Nabozny, Kayla McLoud, Scott Giovino, Kyle Leonard, Taylor Burke, Mikhala Little, Ashley Hicks, Lynnette Richardson, Ashley Bessoni, Tahirah Ojumu, Ashley Prunty, Jessica Sapio, Shiloh Herringshaw, Carly Lenzi, Stefanie Spach, Brendan Oldham, Matthew Zwick, Lindsay Estes, Cassandra Kelly and Thomas Tourigny
Defendant: Matthew J. Fairbairn, TLC North, LLC, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, TLC West, LLC, TLC Central, LLC, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Utica, LLC and T.L. Cannon Corp.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01177
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT.Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 2/28/2019. (jdp, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 TEXT ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION granting #331 Motion to Consolidate Cases for the Purposes of Settlement: The parties have agreed that the interests of economy and avoidance of unnecessary duplication of effort and litigation expense would be best served by consolidation of this action and the related action 3:10-CV-591(TJM/DEP), Roach, et al. v. T.L. Cannon Corp., et al. for purposes of settlement. It is therefore hereby ORDERED, that these two actions be and hereby are consolidated with the first filed action (Civil Action No. 3:10-CV-591) being designated as the lead case and the action subsequently commenced by plaintiff (Civil Action No. 3:18-CV-1177) being designated as the member case, pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, solely for purposes of settlement, without prejudice to any party applying to the court for appropriate relief, if deemed necessary; and it is further ORDERED, that the telephone conference set for 10/11/2018 at 4:00 PM remains in place. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 10/10/2018. (sal )
October 5, 2018 Filing 331 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Settlement Purposes Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2018 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 11/6/2018 filed by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration) Motions referred to David E. Peebles. (Lingle, Michael)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 TEXT ORDER : A Telephone Conference is set for 10/11/2018 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to initiate the call to Chambers, which can be reached at (315) 234-8620. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 10/4/2018. (sal )
October 1, 2018 Filing 329 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney Elena Paraskevas-Thadani, Esq. Email address is ethadani@littler.com. Phone number is 212-583-9600. Admissions due by 10/15/2018. (plp)
October 1, 2018 Filing 328 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:13-cv-06455. electronically transferred when case opened
September 24, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of New York. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #326 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 9/21/2018. (KAH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 326 Joint MOTION to Change Venue For Purposes of Settlement by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Transfer Venue for Purposes of Settlement, #2 Affirmation of Michael J. Lingle)(Lukasiewicz, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 325 LETTER ORDER granting request. Joint status report due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 8/20/2018. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 324 LETTER ORDER granting request. Joint status report due by 8/20/2018. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 7/31/2018. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 323 LETTER ORDER Joint status report due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 6/29/2018. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 322 LETTER ORDER adjourning the 6/13/2018 status conference. A joint status report shall be submitted to this Court by no later than 6/29/2018. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 6/13/2018. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 31, 2018 NOTICE: Status Conference set for 6/13/2018 10:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER denying #281 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #285 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court's #231 Order prohibiting the filing of dispositive motions prior to the close of fact discovery without the Court's permission remains in effect. The Court orders that any further stipulations between the parties in this case requiring Court approval must be submitted to the undersigned. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/12/18. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 320 TEXT ORDER. At the request of the parties, the Court hereby extends its prior order holding in abeyance any decision on the pending orders for summary judgment to March 1, 2018. However, given the length of time this matter has been pending and the significant number of issues that remain unresolved, the Court will not agree to any further extensions of that order. If the parties wish to continue their settlement negotiations prior to the Court issuing a decision on the pending motions, the Court will permit them to withdraw the motions without prejudice to renewal in the event those negotiations are unsuccessful. The parties are instructed to inform the Court of the status of their negotiations by fax no later than March 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/26/2018. (CDH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 319 TEXT ORDER. At the request of the parties, the Court will continue to hold in abeyance any decision on the pending motions for summary judgment through February 22, 2018. The parties are instructed to inform the Court of the status of their settlement negotiations by fax no later than February 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/09/2018. (CDH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 318 TEXT ORDER re #317 Motion to Stay. The Court finds that a complete stay of this matter is not warranted at this time. However, the Court will hold in abeyance any decision on the currently pending motions for summary judgment through February 7, 2018. The parties are instructed to inform the Court of the outcome of the mediation session scheduled for February 7, 2018, by fax no later than February 8, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/29/18. [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 317 MOTION to Stay by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lingle, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 316 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (MOTION) held on 12/14/17, before Judge Elizabeth A. Wolford. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen J. Bush, Telephone number 585-613-4312. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2018. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 14, 2017 Filing 315 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford: Appearances: Jessica Lukasiewicz, Esq./pl; J. Nelson Thomas, Esq./pl.; Craig Benson, Esq./def. and Jessica Pizzutelli, Esq./def. Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2017 re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC, #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ashley Hicks. Court reserves decision. (Court Reporter Karen Bush.) (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting request to allow junior attorney to present oral argument with the understanding that J. Nelson Thomas be allowed to supplement, if necessary. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/21/17. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 313 Mediation Certification by Jill K Schultz(AGB) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting Plaintiffs request to adjourn the motion hearing set for 12/1/2017 regarding the Summary Judgment motions without objection from defense counsel. Motion Hearing reset for 12/14/2017 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/27/2017. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 311 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lukasiewicz, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 310 TEXT ORDER re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment. A Motion Hearing (oral argument) is set for Friday, December 1, 2017, at 9:00 A.M. in U.S. Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester, NY 14614 before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/03/17. (PFC) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 309 TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's referral of this case to "Settlement Week" mediation, Jill K. Schultz is hereby designated to be the Mediator. The session shall be conducted on Tuesday, 11/21/17 beginning at 9:30 AM. The Mediator shall contact the attorneys (or parties if not represented) on pre-session matters. Pursuant to ADR Plan Section 5.6, the parties shall submit a Mediation Memorandum to the Mediator prior to the session. Pursuant to ADR Plan Section 5.8 A, all parties and their counsel are required to attend. Issued by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/14/17. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 308 TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to Sections 2.1(B) and 4.1(A)(5) of the Courts Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan, this case is referred to mediation during a concentrated Settlement Week to be conducted at the United States Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester, New York, during the period of November 13 through 22, 2017. Mediator fees up to a specified amount will be paid by the Districts Clerks Office, the procedure for which will be established prior to the session. The Court will assign a Mediator and select the date and time for the session, and the parties will be so notified by further Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/14/17. (JPL) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 307 Sealed Document. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 306 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 305 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Pizzutelli, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting #303 Motion to Seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/23/17. (JPL)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 16, 2017 Filing 303 MOTION to Seal by Ashley Hicks.(Ferris, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting plaintiffs' request to exceed the memorandum of law in support of its motion page limit by up to 15 pages. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/9/17. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 2, 2017 E-Filing Notification: revised docket text of #298 to "AFFIRMATION in Opposition" to reflect correct filing event. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 1, 2017 Filing 301 Sealed Document. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 1, 2017 Filing 300 Sealed Document. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 1, 2017 Filing 299 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Local Rule 56 Opposing Statement and Counter-Statement of Material Facts, #2 Appendix to Opposing Statement and Counter-Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Pizzutelli, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 1, 2017 Filing 298 AFFIRMATION in Opposition re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ashley Hicks. (Ferris, Jonathan) Modified on 3/2/2017 (JHF). [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 1, 2017 Filing 297 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting #295 Joint Motion to Seal. Parties are directed to send complete, un-redacted versions of the sealed documents to the Clerk's office and Chambers. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/24/17. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 295 Joint MOTION to Seal by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC.(Pizzutelli, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 294 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jonathan W. Ferris on behalf of Amber M Smith. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Ferris, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/13/2017. Replies due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/31/17. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting plaintiffs' request to file a memorandum in opposition to #281 Motion for Summary Judgment not to exceed 30 pages in length. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/31/17. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 30, 2017 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Ferris on behalf of Ashley Hicks (Ferris, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 2/3/2017, Replies due by 3/3/2017. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/18/16. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC, #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ashley Hicks granting parties joint request for an extension to file responses and replies to the above motions. Responses now due by 12/2/2016. Replies now due by 1/13/2017. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/21/2016. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 7, 2016 E-Filing Notification: #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Notice of Motion. A notice of motion is required for all motions, and must state: the relief sought, the grounds for the request, the papers submitted in support, and the return date for the motion, if known. A moving party who intends to file and serve reply papers must so state in the notice of motion. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 7, 2016 Filing 288 STATEMENT OF FACTS Appendix by Ashley Hicks Related document: #286 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #287 Statement of Facts, #285 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (including B-1 - B-8), #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (including D-1 - D-5), #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F (including F-1 - F-5), #7 Exhibit G (including G-1 - G-3), #8 Exhibit H (including H-1), #9 Exhibit I (including I-1), #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K (including A(1)-F(3)), #12 Exhibit L)(Lukasiewicz, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 7, 2016 Filing 287 STATEMENT OF FACTS by Ashley Hicks Related document: #285 Motion for Summary Judgment, #286 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Lukasiewicz, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 7, 2016 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM in Support re #285 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ashley Hicks. (Lukasiewicz, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 7, 2016 Filing 285 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ashley Hicks.(Lukasiewicz, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 3, 2016 Filing 284 Sealed Document (manually filed, maintained in Clerk's Office). (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 3, 2016 Filing 283 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks Withdrawal of Appearance of Jared K. Cook (Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #280 Motion Seeking Leave to File Certain Exhibits, or Portions of Exhibits, Under Seal. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/3/16. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 3, 2016 Filing 281 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica F. Pizzutelli, #2 Exs. 1 - 4, #3 Ex. 5, #4 Exs. 6 - 10, #5 Defendants' Local Rule 56 Statement of Material Facts, #6 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Summary Judgment)(Pizzutelli, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 30, 2016 Filing 280 MOTION Seeking Leave to File Certain Exhibits, or Portions of Exhibits, Under Seal by Ashley Hicks.(Lukasiewicz, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 20, 2016 E-Filing Notification: The correct PDF has been attached to this entry. #279 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Nothing herein shall alter the requirement that, even if agreed upon by the parties, permission and approval from the Court is required to file materials under seal. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/19/2016. (Please note: This docket entry does not contain every detail of this order. It is your responsibility to read and download the pdf to this document for future reference.) (LMD) (Main Document 279 replaced on 9/20/2016) (LMD). (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Nothing herein shall alter the requirement that, even if agreed upon by the parties, permission and approval from the Court is required to file materials under seal. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/19/2016. (Please note: This docket entry does not contain every detail of this order. It is your responsibility to read and download the pdf to this document for future reference.) (LMD) (Main Document 279 replaced on 9/20/2016) (LMD). [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 16, 2016 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz on behalf of Ashley Hicks (Lukasiewicz, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting parties request for an extension from 9/19/2016 to file dispositive motions. Dispositive Motions now due by 9/22/2016. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/15/2016. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting both parties request to exceed the page limit for memorandum of law in support of their dispositive motions not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/12/2016. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 1, 2016 Filing 275 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jared Kimball Cook on behalf of Stacey Colleen Gale, Amy Mclaren, Crystal Dawn Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 274 TEXT ORDER re #273 Status Report. The Court's Decision and Order dated November 5, 2014 (Dkt. 231), shall not prohibit the parties from proceeding with dispositive motion practice as outlined in Mr. Thomas' letter dated June 1, 2016 (Dkt. 273). SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/06/2016. (CDH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 1, 2016 Filing 273 STATUS REPORT by Ashley Hicks. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 23, 2016 Filing 272 LETTER ORDER (Plaintiffs' Report on Damages due by 6/10/2016. Defendants' Report on Damages (rebuttal) due by 7/8/2016. Completion of Expert Depositions due by 8/8/2016. Supplement Reports due by 8/22/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2016. The parties shall execute the remainder of their stipulation and submit it to Judge Wolford for review and approval.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/23/2016. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 16, 2016 Filing 271 LETTER ORDER granting request for a one-week extension until 5/19/2016 to submit a joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/16/2016. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 27, 2016 Filing 270 TEXT ORDER The parties shall submit to this Court by no later than May 12, 2016 a joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/27/2016. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 15, 2016 NOTICE: Status Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel for each side are directed to send Judge Payson a letter by no later than Noon on Friday, 4/22/2016, outlining the issues to be addressed at the conference. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 2, 2016 Filing 269 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2016. Appearances: Jared K. Cook, Esq. and J. Nelson Thomas, Esq.; Craig R. Benson, Esq. (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 18, 2016 E-Filing Notification: Letters, such as #268 REPLY/RESPONSE, are never filed in the WDNY without first obtaining the Court's permission. Filed documents should always be in proper pleading format. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 17, 2016 Filing 268 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #267 Order, Set Hearings,, filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit : Excerpt from the Transcript of the December 15, 2015 Susan Sabio Deposition)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 10, 2016 Filing 267 LETTER ORDER (Counsel for defendants shall respond in writing to this letter to summarize their position by no later than 2/19/2016. A telephone status conference shall be held on 3/2/2016 at 10:15 AM to discuss the issue. Counsel are directed to telephone chambers at that time to participate in the call.) (Status Conference set for 3/2/2016 10:15 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 2/10/2016. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 7, 2016 NOTICE: Oral Argument set for 2/9/2016 at 2:00 PM on plaintiff's motion to maintain the confidentiality of certain documents #261 is CANCELLED pursuant to the parties' stipulated order filed on 1/7/2016 #266 . (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: confidential documents and plaintiffs' withdrawal of their motion #261 . Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 1/7/2016. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 30, 2015 Filing 265 AMENDED MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #261 MOTION to Maintain Confidentiality filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC (Responses due by 1/8/2016. Replies due by 1/19/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2016 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/30/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 9, 2015 Filing 264 LETTER ORDER granting plaintiffs' request to adjourn for 30 days class counsel's deadline to file an opposition to defendants' motion #261 . Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/9/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 24, 2015 Filing 262 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #261 MOTION to Maintain Confidentiality filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC. (Responses due by 12/8/2015. Replies due by 12/18/2015. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2016 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 11/24/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 23, 2015 Filing 263 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Telephone Conference held on 11/23/2015. Appearances: Jared K. Cook, Esq. and Frank S. Gattuso, Esq., Jessica F. Pizzutelli, Esq. (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 19, 2015 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 11/23/2015 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Parties are directed to call chambers at 585-613-4080 promptly at 10:00 AM to be connected into the conference call. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 9, 2015 Filing 261 MOTION to Maintain Confidentiality by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Pizzutelli, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Maintain Confidentiality)(Pizzutelli, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 3, 2015 Filing 260 DECISION & ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion to compel #234 . Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 9/3/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER re: motion to compel. This Court anticipates issuing a decision on the motion by no later than 9/4/15. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 8/31/15. (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 258 Letter from Jared K. Cook, dated 6/16/2015, advising that the parties have reached an agreement that resolves plaintiffs' #245 Motion to Compel. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 17, 2015 NOTICE: The Motion Hearing set to be held on 6/17/2015 at 3:30 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson on plaintiffs' #245 MOTION to Compel & MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is CANCELLED. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 27, 2015 Filing 257 LETTER ORDER granting request to extend the deadline to file dispositive motions from 6/1/2015 until 30 days after any additional discovery deadlines set by the Court when a determination is made on plaintiffs' motion to compel #234 , or plaintiffs' motion to compel #245 , whichever occurs later. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/27/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 27, 2015 Filing 256 LETTER ORDER granting request to reschedule oral argument on #245 MOTION to Compel & MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks. (Motion Hearing adjourned to 6/17/2015 at 3:30 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/27/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 22, 2015 Filing 255 REPLY to Response to Motion re #245 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Ashley Hicks. (Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 254 LETTER ORDER granting plaintiffs' request for an extension of time to file their reply papers re #245 MOTION to Compel & MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks. (Replies due by 5/22/2015.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/18/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 30, 2015 Filing 253 NOTICE by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC of Withdrawal as Counsel (Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 30, 2015 Filing 252 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #245 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Benson, #2 Exhibits A-F, #3 Exhibits G-K)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 30, 2015 Filing 251 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica F. Pizzutelli (Pizzutelli, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 30, 2015 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica F. Pizzutelli on behalf of All Defendants (Pizzutelli, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STIPULATION AND ORDER (Defendants do not need any additional discovery for purposes of the dispositive motions contemplated in Docket #225 regarding plaintiffs' "Pay Statement Claims.") Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/16/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 9, 2015 Filing 248 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Status Conference held on 4/9/2015. Appearances: J. Nelson Thomas, Esq., Erin W. Smith, Esq. and Jessica Pizzutelli, Esq., Craig R. Benson, Esq. by telephone (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER re #245 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks. Responses due by 4/30/2015. Replies due by 5/14/2015. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/9/15. (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 2, 2015 Filing 246 LETTER ORDER (In-Person Conference rescheduled to 4/9/2015 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/2/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 1, 2015 Filing 245 MOTION to Compel , MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 31, 2015 NOTICE: In-Person Conference set for 4/9/2015 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson, 2310 U.S. Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester, NY. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION AND ORDER as to the production of plaintiffs' discovery demands. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/24/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 18, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (MOTION Transcribed from an Electronic Recording Device) held on 1/22/15, before Judge Marian W. Payson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen J. Bush, RPR, Telephone number 585-613-4312. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 12, 2015 Filing 242 LETTER ORDER (Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to respond to this letter and provide their position on the requests contained in the letter by no later than 3/18/2015.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/12/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY ON CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/10/2015. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 30, 2015 Filing 240 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #234 MOTION to Compel , 239 Motion Hearing,, Supplemental Authorities filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 22, 2015 Filing 239 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2015 re #234 MOTION to Compel filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks. Mr. Benson to submit cases by 1/30/15 re: FSLA cases where the affirmative defense to liquidated damages was asserted. Mr. Benson should also include his interrogatory responses. Mr. Thomas to respond by 2/9/15.Appearances: Jared Cook, Esq. and J. Nelson Thomas, Esq. for plaintiffs; Craig R. Benson, Esq. and Erin Smith, Esq. for defendants(Digital Recording) (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 13, 2015 Filing 238 REPLY to Response to Motion re #234 MOTION to Compel filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 237 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #234 MOTION to Compel filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig R. Benson, #2 Exhibit A-C to Benson Declaration, #3 Exhibit D to Benson Declaration, #4 Exhibit E-H to Benson Declaration)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 236 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jared Kimball Cook on behalf of Hannah Edlen. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 235 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #234 MOTION to Compel filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks (Responses due by 12/30/2014. Replies due by 1/13/2015. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/10/2014. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 5, 2014 Filing 234 MOTION to Compel by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER approving proposed notice and revised subclass definitions. Exhibit A is the agreed form of notice. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 232 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Brittney Driscoll. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER re: #228 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court declines to exercise its discretion to entertain a second motion for partial summary judgment. The parties are ordered not to file any further dispositive motions prior to the close of fact discovery without leave of the Court. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/05/2014. (CDH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 4, 2014 Filing 230 Mediation Certification by William G. Bauer(Bauer, William) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 31, 2014 Filing 229 STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Related document: #228 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 31, 2014 Filing 228 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting the parties' request for an extension until 10/31/2014 to submit a joint proposed notice for the Rule 23 class to the Court. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/28/2014. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 9, 2014 Filing 226 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Status Conference held on 10/9/2014. Appearances: Jared K. Cook, Esq. and J. Nelson Thomas, Esq., Erin W. Smith, Esq., Craig R. Benson, Esq. by telephone (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Discovery to be completed by 4/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2015. Responses due 30 days from the filing of the motion. Replies due 14 days from the filing of responses. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/9/2014. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER denying #208 Motion to Stay; denying #214 Motion for Reconsideration. The parties are instructed to submit the class certification submissions required by the Court's August 5, 2014, Decision and Order within twenty (20) days. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/08/2014. (CDH). [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 1, 2014 Filing 223 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Jaclyn Blackmer. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 24, 2014 Filing 222 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support re #214 MOTION for Reconsideration re #205 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 18, 2014 Filing 221 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #214 MOTION for Reconsideration re #205 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 17, 2014 Filing 220 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Colleen Ehrgott. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 15, 2014 E-Filing Notification: revised docket text of #219 to reflect correct filing event. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 12, 2014 Filing 219 REPLY Memorandum in Support re #208 MOTION to Stay filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Paraskevas-Thadani, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Paraskevas-Thadani, Elena) Modified on 9/15/2014 (JHF). [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 9, 2014 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #208 MOTION to Stay, filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 9, 2014 NOTICE: The Status Conference set for 9/3/2014 has been adjourned to 10/9/2014 at 11:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 217 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 8, 2014 E-Filing Notification: revised docket text of #216 to "DISCOVERY PLAN by All Plaintiffs" to reflect correct filing event. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 5, 2014 Filing 216 DISCOVERY PLAN by All Plaintiffs. (Cook, Jared) Modified on 9/8/2014 (JHF). [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 215 TEXT ORDER re: #214 Motion for Reconsideration. Responsive papers, if any, shall be due by 9/18/2014. Reply papers, if any, shall be due by 9/24/2014. Upon completion of briefing, the motion will be deemed submitted and decided on the papers. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/03/2014. (CDH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 2, 2014 Filing 214 MOTION for Reconsideration re #205 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Craig R. Benson, #3 Exhibits A-F to Benson Declaration)(Benson, Craig) Modified on 9/3/2014 (JHF). [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 2, 2014 Filing 213 TEXT ORDER granting in part #212 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' deadline to file opposition papers re #208 Motion to Stay is extended to 9/9/2014. Defendants' deadline to file reply papers re #208 Motion to Stay is extended to 9/12/2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/02/2014. (CDH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #208 MOTION to Stay re #205 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #207 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting the request by Erin W. Smith to extend the deadline to submit a joint discovery to 9/5/14. The conference set for 9/3/14 is adjourned. The parties will provide mutual available dates to the Court to reschedule the conference. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 8/26/14. (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER (Status Conference set for 9/3/2014 10:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson; joint proposed discovery plan due by 8/25/2014.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 8/21/2014. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 19, 2014 Filing 209 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #208 MOTION to Stay re #205 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #207 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC, Plaintiffs' Responses due by 9/2/2014, Any Replies due by 9/5/2014. This motion will be deemed submitted on the papers unless, upon review, the Court decides that oral argument is necessary. The Court sua sponte stays the class certification deadlines set forth in the #205 Decision and Order filed 8/5/2014, until further order of the Court. The Court's sua sponte order to stay does not extend to discovery or to any of the deadlines set forth in the Courts #207 mediation order filed 8/11/2014. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/19/2014. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 208 MOTION to Stay re #205 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #207 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin W. Smith, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Stay)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 11, 2014 Filing 207 MEDIATION ORDER. Initial Mediation Session due by 10/31/2014. Not less than 7 days before the initial mediation session, each party shall provide the Mediator with a memorandum in accordance with Section 5.6 of the ADR Plan. Please note: This docket entry does not contain every detail of this order. It is your responsibility to read and download the pdf to this document for future reference. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/11/2014. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 11, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion) held on 5/13/14, before Judge Elizabeth A. Wolford. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen J. Bush, RPR, Telephone number 585-613-4312. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2014. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #143 Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part #144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #176 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' motion is granted as to Ms. Raymond's wage notice claim against TLC West, LLC, only, and denied in all other respects. Defendants' cross-motion for partial summary judgment is denied. Plaintiffs' motion to certify class pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 is granted. The Court directs the parties to work in good faith to agree on any necessary revisions to the Court's proposed subclasses or, if an agreement cannot be reached, to submit any proposed changes to the Court's proposed redefinition outlining each parties' respective positions within twenty (20) days of entry of this Decision and Order. Additionally, the parties are directed to confer in good faith and submit a joint letter to the Court proposing a single form of notice for the Rule 23 class within twenty (20) days of entry of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/5/2014. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 30, 2014 Filing 204 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Mary Slater. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Gattuso on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gattuso, Frank) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 202 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Nichole Potter, Colleen Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 13, 2014 Filing 201 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford: Appearances: Nelson Thomas, Esq./pl.; Jared Cook, Esq./pl.; Craig Benson, Esq./def. and Erin Smith, Esq./def. Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2014 re #176 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC, #143 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks, #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks, #178 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re-filed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion re #176 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC. Court reserves decision. Motions Submitted. (Court Reporter KB.) (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 12, 2014 Filing 200 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Bianca Decker. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 9, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond of Withdrawal as Counsel (Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 8, 2014 Filing 198 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Samuel Carty, Lauren Edwards, Scott Giovino, Shiloh Herringshaw, Alyssa Hutton, Stacey McLeer, Falesha Mechanick. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 17, 2014 Filing 197 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #176 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #178 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re-filed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion re #176 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 17, 2014 E-Filing Notification: The following entry has been edited to reflect the following motions are adjourned from May 6, 2014 2:00 PM to May 13, 2014 at 10:00 AM. #196 ORDER re #176 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC, #143 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks, #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks, #178 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re-filed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion re #176 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC, Motion Hearing/oral argument reset from 5/6/2014 2:00 PM to 5/13/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/16/2014. (LMD) Modified on 4/17/2014 (LMD). (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER re #176 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC, #143 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks, #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks, #178 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re-filed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion re #176 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John A. Perry, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC, Motion Hearing/oral argument reset from 5/6/2014 2:00 PM to 5/13/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/16/2014. (LMD) Modified on 4/17/2014 (LMD). [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 195 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Lorraine Butler, Rachel Kiehlmeier, Danielle McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 7, 2014 Filing 194 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Alisa Brophy, Marilyn Carkner, Brittany Davis, Sean Francis, Joseph Gegeny, Shayona Lewis, Shawna Mariano, Sarah Milograno, Sabrina Noel, Donna Nupp, Ashley Prunty, Eric Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 4, 2014 Filing 193 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Jessica Bonaventura, Sadie Breen, Jessica Coons, Jill Cooper, Lana Dube, Kelley Foster, Melissa Hartwig, Lindsay Malek, Luke Manley, Katherine Pinkowski, Rachel Pullano, Mariah Reploeg-Fitzgerald, Dominick Scafidi, Sharon Veronick. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 3, 2014 Filing 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 3, 2014 Filing 191 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #178 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re-filed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion re #176 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #177 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #10 Certificate of Service)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 190 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request to file a consolidated memorandum of not more than 35 pages. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/02/2014. (CDH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 189 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Angela Wayman. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 31, 2014 Filing 188 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Hannah Biehn, Rebecca Holt, Thomas Tourigny, Meghan Tuma. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 28, 2014 Filing 187 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Gregory Cook, Joseph Crane, Hannah Dillenburg, Jeremy Evans, Brandi-Lyn Heidenreich, Yavonna McMorris, Denise Nies, Jaina Urbanski. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 186 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Nicole Jerard, Estelle Kreps, Melissa Mauriello, Julie Moore, Brianna Smith. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 24, 2014 Filing 185 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Caitlin Bimont, Jennifer Coombs, Ashley Liguori, Alyssa Morris, Tyler Nielsen, Sacha Vega, DeMarquis Williams. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 21, 2014 Filing 184 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Maria Burghezi, Edward Keeley, Jenna Renouf, Sofia Sainz, Alyssa Sharrow, Tara Werner. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 20, 2014 Filing 183 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Stephanie Cappello, Keli Locker, Pamela Postlewait, Courtney Richards, Joseph Smith, Carrie Young. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION AND ORDER as to #143 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 & #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (The parties are directed to contact this Court upon the district court's determination of either #143 or #144 , whichever is first, to submit a proposed amended scheduling order.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/18/2014. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 181 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Jordan Olinsky, Chelsea Zakowski. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 17, 2014 Filing 180 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Loni Buckholz, Narseary Johnson, Lauri Soos. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 14, 2014 Filing 179 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Janett Vega. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 14, 2014 Filing 178 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re-filed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion re #176 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 14, 2014 E-Filing Notification: Document missing attorneys electronic signature. Action required: re-file document with proper signature and new proof of service. Attachment # 13 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion RE #176 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (TA) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 13, 2014 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #143 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 13, 2014 Filing 176 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig R. Benson, #2 Exhibit A-G to Benson Declaration, #3 Local Rule 56 Counter-Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Material Facts, #4 Appendix to Defendants' Local Rule 56 Counter Statement of Material Facts and Statement of Material Facts, #5 Exhibit 1, 1A, 1B to Appendix, #6 Exhibit 2 to Appendix, #7 Exhibit 2A to Appendix, #8 Exhibit 2B to Appendix, #9 Exhibit 2C to Appendix, #10 Exhibit 2D to 2L to Appendix, #11 Exhibit 3 to Appendix, #12 Exhibit 4 to Appendix, #13 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, #14 Certificate of Service)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 13, 2014 Filing 175 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Tammie Creary, Lisa Percopo. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 174 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Kimberly Gates, Morgan McHale. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 10, 2014 Filing 173 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Addison Marino, Elizabeth Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 7, 2014 Filing 172 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Lisa McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 171 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Clarissa Beadles, Brianna Caldwell, Cassandra Copes, Kaitlyn French, Meaghan Hillery, Samantha Klewicki, Nathan LaMattina, Lindsey Murdoch, Jamie Shaughnessy. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 5, 2014 Filing 170 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Sharifa Whitt. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 4, 2014 Filing 169 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Rebecca Bugarin, Stephen Light, Danielle Parker, Evan Phillips, Jessica Rochelle, Emily Steitz. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 3, 2014 Filing 168 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Amanda Collier, Melissa Dickman, Samantha Harris, Megan He, Kyle Leonard, Catherine Leonardi, Shaun Light, Gina Mirando, Allison Myers, Brendan Oldham, Ashley Palumbo, Kayla Snyder Hayes, Jennifer Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 28, 2014 Filing 167 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Kenneth Heppner, Angela Krezmer, Liza LaLomia, Amanda McLane, Rebecca Ortiz, Steven Reid, Tresea Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 27, 2014 Filing 166 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Gilda Bermudez, Amanda Blesinger, Brooke Burnside. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 26, 2014 Filing 165 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Teresa Congiusti, Deidra Cross, Stacy Culver, Else Davis, Julia Fanghella, Catherine Flint, John Gizzarelli, Samantha Keener Kasulis, Maura Kinney-Palix, Kristina Moller, Michelle Moller, Carrie Rosenzweig, Stefanie Spach, Emily Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 24, 2014 Filing 164 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Amy Batza, Amanda Boushee, Doris Caskey, Lacey Geis, Shannon Hurchla, Eva LaFlesh, Nicholas Maenza, Georgina Mitchell, Devin Neuwirth, Katie Rukus, Janine Tompkins, Felicia Townsend, Mallory Udick, Thomas VanBuren. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 21, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion) held on 2/5/14, before Judge Elizabeth A. Wolford. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen J. Bush, RPR, Telephone number 585-613-4312. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2014. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 21, 2014 Filing 162 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Samantha Alessandra, Jessica Baker, Emily Bryan, Lara Frazee, Jessica Gardner, Arlene Gray, Meaghan Hogan, Chelsea Kanaval, Timothy Vaughn, Melissa Wilk, Jamie Yates. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 20, 2014 Filing 161 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Nicole Englert. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 19, 2014 Filing 160 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Brandi Anderson, Marie Baker, Jamie Bemis, Courtney Berg, Ashley Blackwell, Amanda Burgio, Erika Koestle, Dawn Mas, Carrie Morris, Panida Promnoi, Kimberly Stetson-Gelinas, Carli Teats, Jack Upton. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 18, 2014 Filing 159 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Cassandra Anello, Donielle Bates, Danielle Bennett, Ashley Bessoni, Mary Brooks, Halley Collister, Tracy Donovan, James Frasier, Jr, Krista Huey, Victoria Jones, James Lenga, Carly Lenzi, Kayla McLoud, Kara Morris, Nicole Nowatzki, Alyssa O'Bryan, Rachael Paradis, Lynnette Richardson, Julie Salisbury, John Speta, Tiffany Yerico, Laura Zipprich. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 14, 2014 Filing 158 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Omar Acevedo, Jennifer Arcuri, Victoria Brown, Ashley Carley, Ashley Giles, Con-Jo Harris, Jonathan Kelleher, Kasandra Knapp, Teresa Olivapotenza, Christina Socci, Alexandra Soper, Desiree Tesoriero, Tabitha Walker. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 13, 2014 Filing 157 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Scott Barr, Christina Bedir, Rodney Bennett, Amanda Damian, Brendan Ference, Marchietta Green, Kristen Groover, Caitlin Guido, Savannah Hempstead, Nickcole Miller, Thomas Mills, Lindsay Moss, Tahirah Ojumu, Jessica Sapio, Kelsey Schuhle, Patricia Voorhees, Kathryn Wagner, Amanda Werner. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 12, 2014 Filing 156 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Courtney Andersen, Maria Boylan, Taylor Burke, Tracy Daniels, Margaret Infantino, Angela Kondracki, Kelly Kulik, Christian LaValle, Mikhala Little, Joseph Milligan, Amie Nix, Casey Rulison, Katie Stites, Jamie Woods, Justin Wray, Hannah Yurksaitis, Matthew Zwick. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 11, 2014 Filing 155 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Siobhan Cherry, Vanessa Coutant, Michelle Eason, Lindsay Estes, Crystal First-Nabozny, Lisa Fitzgerald, Brittney Gagnon, Kaylea Hayden, Misty Hofert, Tracy Kearney, Cassandra Kelly, Robyn King, Justin Love, Alison Lorenc, Jacquelyn Moore, Lisamarie Murphy, Meghan Olney, Erica Perkins, Roodley Preval, Beth Reding, Casey Schmidt, Margaret Savino, Ashley Stafford, Bianca Valentino, Xavier Velez. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 10, 2014 Filing 154 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Ericka Acquilano, Kelsie Adams, Emily Coppenrath, Donna Deters, Ashleigh Fobare, Tonya Fry, Arica Gessi, Deborah Gueth, James Joseph, Nadie Phoenix, Robin Powers, Brandy Selover, Shauna Weber. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 7, 2014 Filing 153 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of David Alvarado, Ashton Battaglia, Dawn Hayes, Joshua Montanaro, Kimberly Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 6, 2014 Filing 152 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Amy Sherwood. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER re #143 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks, #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks. Defendants' deadline to file any responding papers to the pending motions and to file any cross-motions related to the same shall be 3/13/2014. Plaintiffs' deadline to file reply papers in support of their pending motions and any responding papers to any cross-motions filed by defendants shall be 4/3/2014. Defendant's deadline to file any reply papers in support of any cross-motions shall be 4/17/2014. Motion Hearing (oral argument) on all the motions set for 5/6/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. ORDERED THAT ONE COURTESY COPY OF EACH FILING BE PROVIDED TO THE COURT THE TIME OF FILING, PREFERABLY IN A THREE-RING BINDER.Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/5/2014. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 5, 2014 Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford: Appearances by phone: Nelson Thomas, Esq./pl.; Justin Cordelo, Esq./pl; Erin Smith,Esq/def.; Craig Benson, Esq./def.Status Conference held on 2/5/2014.Motion scheduling deadlines set. Order issued. (Court Reporter Karen Bush.) (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 5, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset from 2/5/2014 4:00 PM to 2/5/2014 03:00 PM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Counsel will be present in person, however Craig Benson, Esq. has been granted permission to participate by phone and the Court will call Mr. Benson for this conference. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 4, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/5/2014 04:00 PM before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford, 100 State Street, Rochester, New York. Counsel will be present in person, however Craig Benson, Esq. has been granted permission to participate by phone and the Court will call Mr. Benson for this conference. (LMD) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 4, 2014 Filing 149 LETTER ORDER granting request to extend discovery by 45 days to 4/14/2014. (Discovery to be completed by 4/14/2014.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 2/4/2014. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 29, 2014 Filing 148 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford for all further proceedings. Hon. Michael A. Telesca no longer assigned to case. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 1/29/14. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 29, 2014 Filing 147 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-TEXT ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Elizabeth Wolford. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 1/29/14. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 27, 2014 Filing 146 STATEMENT OF FACTS by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Related document: #144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit C-1, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit D-1 (Part 1 of 2), #11 Exhibit D-1 (Part 2 of 2), #12 Exhibit E (Part 1 of 2), #13 Exhibit E (Part 2 of 2), #14 Exhibit E-1 (Part 1 of 2), #15 Exhibit E-1 (Part 2 of 2), #16 Exhibit F (Part 1 of 2), #17 Exhibit F (Part 2 of 2), #18 Exhibit F-1 (Part 1 of 2), #19 Exhibit F-1 (Part 2 of 2), #20 Exhibit G, #21 Exhibit G-1 (Part 1 of 2), #22 Exhibit G-1 (Part 2 of 2), #23 Exhibit H, #24 Exhibit H-1, #25 Exhibit I, #26 Exhibit I-1, #27 Exhibit J, #28 Exhibit J-1)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 27, 2014 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1 through 2 byAshley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 27, 2014 Filing 144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond.(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 27, 2014 Filing 143 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affirmation of Justin M. Cordello, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 31, 2013 Filing 142 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Carmen Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 20, 2013 Filing 141 LETTER ORDER granting final proposed notice of collective action. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/20/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 10, 2013 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2013 re #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice and #134 Cross MOTION Approval of Defendants' Collective Action Notice. The motions are granted in part and denied in part.Appearances: Justin M. Cordello, Esq. for plaintiffs; Erin W. Smith, Esq. for defendants(Digital Recording) (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #128 plaintiffs' motion for approval of their proposed collective action notice; granting in part and denying in part #134 defendants' cross-motion for approval of their proposed collective action notice. The parties are directed to confer regarding a proposed notice of collective action and submit a jointly-approved proposed notice of collective action for the Court's review and approval by 12/17/2013. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/10/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 6, 2013 Filing 138 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #134 Cross MOTION Approval of Defendants' Collective Action Notice re #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin W. Smith, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 3, 2013 E-Filing Notification: revised docket of #137 to clarify the filing event. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 2, 2013 Filing 137 REPLY in Further Support of #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice and Opposition to #134 Cross MOTION Approval of Defendants' Collective Action Notice, filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Justin M. Cordello, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Cordello, Justin) Modified on 12/3/2013 (JHF). [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 27, 2013 Filing 136 LETTER ORDER granting plaintiffs' request to file on 12/2/2013, a consolidated reply to #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice and opposition to #134 Cross MOTION Approval of Defendants' Collective Action Notice. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 11/27/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 18, 2013 Filing 135 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Matthew McDaniels. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 15, 2013 Filing 134 Cross MOTION Approval of Defendants' Collective Action Notice re #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Approval of Collective Action Notice and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Collective Action Notice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Approval of Collective Action Notice and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Collective Action Notice, #8 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 30, 2013 Filing 133 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks (Responses due by 11/15/2013. Replies due by 12/2/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2013 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/30/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 21, 2013 E-Filing Notification: Letters such as #127 NOTICE should not be filed without the Court's prior permission. Action required: re-file document in proper pleading format if prior permission from the Court was not attained. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2013 Filing 132 DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) See Order for further deadlines. Discovery for purposes of Rule 23 certification to be completed by 2/28/2014. Plaintiffs are permitted to move for Rule 23 certification anytime during limited discovery period, but no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. Defendants to complete their ESI production pertaining to the nine, tier one custodians by 11/15/2013. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/18/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2013 Filing 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond re #130 Affirmation, #129 Memorandum in Support, #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice (Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2013 Filing 130 AFFIRMATION re #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2013 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice byAshley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2013 Filing 128 MOTION for Approval of Collective Action Notice by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond.(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC Proposed Notice to Potential Party Plaintiff and Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 16, 2013 Filing 126 DISCOVERY PLAN by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC.(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 11, 2013 Filing 125 LETTER ORDER granting request permit the parties to file their proposed discovery plan by no later than 10/16/2013. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/11/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Status Conference held on 10/1/2013. Appearances: Justin M. Cordello, Esq. and J. Nelson Thomas, Esq. for plaintiffs; Erin W. Smith, Esq. and Craig R. Benson, Esq. for defendants (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 24, 2013 Filing 123 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Jessica Zapf. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 13, 2013 Filing 122 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Jessica Dobucki. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond of Withdrawal of Tara Lester (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 9, 2013 NOTICE: Status Conference set for 10/1/2013 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 8/27/13. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 27, 2013 Filing 118 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 3:13-cv-00642. [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 26, 2013 Filing 120 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Ashley Hicks. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #95 motion. The motion is denied inasmuch as it asks the Court to reconsider Judge Telesca's Decision and Order. The motion is granted inasmuch as it asks to transfer the matter back to the Western District of New York. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 8/23/2013. (amt) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 23, 2013 Minute Entry: MOTION CALENDAR held 8/23/2013 bef Sr. District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy in Binghamton, NY: APP: J. Nelson Thomas, Justin Cordello & Jared Cook, Esqs. for Pltfs; Craig Benson & Erin Smith, Esqs. for Defts; CR: V. Theleman; CRD/cml. Pltfs' #95 MOTION for Reconsideration of WDNY Judge Telesca's #93 Order - RESERVED; written order to issue. (cml) [ 11:00a - 11:49a ] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 22, 2013 Filing 116 RESPONSE TO LETTER BRIEF filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central, LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC as to #115 Letter Request/Motion filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 21, 2013 Filing 115 Letter Motion from Jared K. Cook for Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond requesting Consideration of Supplemental Affirmation submitted to Judge McAvoy . (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 21, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared K. Cook on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cook, Jared) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 20, 2013 TEXT ONLY NOTICE advising parties that Pltfs' #95 MOTION for Reconsideration of #93 Order & MOTION to Transfer Case returnable on 8/23/13 will hear ORAL ARGUMENT at 11:00 AM in Binghamton, NY bef Sr. District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy (cml) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 19, 2013 COURT'S TEXT NOTICE to parties advising that the pending motion for 8/23/13 will hear ORAL ARGUMENT at 10 AM in Binghamton before Judge McAvoy. (sfp, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 2, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Lisa Ozminkowski (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
August 1, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Lisa Cook, Nicole Hobbs, Suzanne Lovall, and Jacquelyn Nadeau (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 26, 2013 Minute Entry: MOTION CALENDAR held 7/26/2013 bef Sr. District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy in Binghamton, NY: APP: None; CR: V. Theleman; CRD/cml. Pltfs' #95 MOTION for Reconsideration WDNY Judge Telesca's #93 Transfer Order - ADJOURNED until 8/23/13 in Binghamton. (cml) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 25, 2013 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Change Venue MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Certificate of Service)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 25, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Shana Bondanella, Kayla Cataldo, Heather Hanlon, Gail Kemp, James Lewis, and Stephanie Overocker (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 15, 2013 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Pltf's #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Change Venue and MOTION to Transfer Case has been adjourned to Judge McAvoy's 8/23/13 Motion Calendar at 10 AM in Binghamton. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/25/2013. (sfp, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TEXT ORDER granting #108 Stipulation to adjourn #95 Motion to Judge McAvoy's 8/23/13 motion calendar. Reply due 7/25/13. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/15/13. (sfp, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 12, 2013 Filing 108 STIPULATION requesting extension of time to file reply in support of motion for reconsideration by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond submitted to Judge McAvoy. (Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 12, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Jessica Harper (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 11, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Patrick Allsopp (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 9, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Amber Braun, Ashlee Clark, Angela Collazo, Nicole Dann, Lauri-Ann Hebert, Terrence Jackson, Elizabeth Krakowski, Kayleigh McGann, Marlene Ohar, David Pfeiffer, and Walter Searcy (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 9, 2013 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Change Venue MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central, LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Certificate of Service)(Paraskevas-Thadani, Elena) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 8, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Rachel Garcia (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TEXT ORDER granting #101 Letter Request. The notice attached to the #101 letter request is approved and the parties are to arrange for it to be mailed to the seven opt-in plaintiffs, which are Audra Brouse, Nicole McCoy, Tiffany Pedro, Matthew Hills, Jillian Phelps, Lindsay Pskowski, and Amanda Resue. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 7/8/13. (sal, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 3, 2013 Filing 101 Letter Motion from Erin W. Smith for Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central, LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC requesting Notice Approval submitted to Judge David E. Peebles . (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER approving the #99 Tolling Agreement, Stipulated Discovery and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 7/2/2013. (amt) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
July 1, 2013 Filing 99 STIPULATION re Telephone Conference,, Proposed Tolling Agreement, Stipulated Discovery and Scheduling Order by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central, LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC submitted to Judge David E. Peebles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 27, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Charles Amons, Jessica Divincenzo, and Peter Pineda (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 26, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Michael Olson, Jr. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 25, 2013 COURT'S TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Pltf's #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order / Transfer Case is placed on Judge McAvoy's 7/26/13 Motion Calendar at 10 AM in Binghamton. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2013. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/15/2013. (sfp, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 21, 2013 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles: Telephone Conference held on 6/21/2013. Parties discuss the status of this case and advise more time is needed to meet the current schedule. Parties are directed to confer further and propose jointly or counter-propose a revised schedule on or before 7/5/2013. If the parties are unable to resolve the dispute as outlined in defendant's #96 letter by 7/5/2013, a telephone conference will be scheduled and a briefing schedule will thereafter be set by the court. APP: Jared Cook, Esq., Michael Lingle, Esq., Justin Cordello, Esq., Craig Benson, Esq., and Erin Smith, Esq.. (sal, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T. L. Cannon Management Corp., T.L. Cannon Corp., TLC Central, LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC re Set/Reset Hearings, Letter regarding unresolved issue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 18, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Change Venue , MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Memorandum of Law, #7 Appendix, #8 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to David E. Peebles. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 14, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Telephone Conference is set in this matter for 6/21/2013 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call to Chambers, which can be reached at (315) 234-8620. If plaintiff's counsel would like to use a service for this call, please provide all counsel and the court with a call-number and passcode for this conference call. (sal, ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 6, 2013 CLERK'S TEXT NOTICE TO COUNSEL, advising of case number and judge assignment in NYND. (cbm ) [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 5, 2013 Filing 94 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:12-cv-06517. electronically transferred when case opened [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
June 4, 2013 Filing 93 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- ORDER denying #55 Motion to Strike ; granting #24 Motion to Change Venue.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 6/4/13. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Status Conference held on 5/28/2013. Appearances: Justice M. Cordello, Esq., J. Nelson Thomas, Esq., Erin W. Smith, Esq. (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 91 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorney. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 90 ANSWER to #82 Amended Complaint by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 14, 2013 Filing 88 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Corinne Doolity. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 10, 2013 Filing 87 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY, PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FRE 502(D) AND (E) CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/10/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
May 8, 2013 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Status Conference held on 5/8/2013. Appearances: Justin M. Cordello, Esq. and J. Nelson Thomas, Esq. for plaintiffs Erin W. Smith, Esq. for defendants (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 19, 2013 Filing 86 LETTER ORDER granting request to extend defendants' time to answer plaintiffs' amended complaint to 5/24/2013. (Answer due date updated as to All Defendants). Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/19/2013. (KAH) (Main Document 86 replaced on 4/19/2013) (KAH). [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Tolling Agreement, Stipulated Discovery and Scheduling Order. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/17/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 17, 2013 Filing 84 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Aleia Sanspree. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 11, 2013 Filing 83 STIPULATION Tolling Agreement, Stipulated Discovery and Scheduling Order by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 10, 2013 Filing 82 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 5, 2013 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2013. Appearances: Justin M. Cordello, Esq., J. Nelson Thomas, Esq., Erin W. Smith, Esq., Craig R. Benson, Esq. (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #77 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiffs are directed to file and serve their Amended Complaint by 4/15/2013. Oral Argument scheduled for 5/15/2013 at 2:00 PM is cancelled. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/1/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
April 1, 2013 Filing 79 Letter from Erin W. Smith, Esq., counsel for defendants, dated 2/28/2013, advising that defendants do not oppose plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint #77 . (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re #77 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #76 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint filed by Ashley Hicks. Responses due by 4/11/2013. Replies due by 4/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/28/13. (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 21, 2013 Filing 77 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #75 Motion to Amend/Correct by Ashley Hicks. Modified on 3/25/2013 to link to correct event. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Amend or Correct. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 3/20/2013. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 15, 2013 Filing 75 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Justin M. Cordello, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Service)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 7, 2013 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael A. Telesca: Motion was submitted without oral argument on 3/7/2013 re #55 MOTION to Strike #52 Reply/Response,, filed by Ashley Hicks. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 5, 2013 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT regarding Electronic Discovery by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Paraskevas-Thadani, Elena) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 5, 2013 Filing 72 *Filed in error* STATUS REPORT regarding ESI by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Paraskevas-Thadani, Elena) Modified on 3/6/2013 (TA). [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 5, 2013 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT regarding Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 5, 2013 Filing 70 STATUS REPORT regarding the proposed Confidentiality Agreement by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
March 1, 2013 Filing 69 LETTER ORDER granting request. Parties are to advise the Court in writing by 3/5/2013 re: status of any disputes regarding electronically-stored information and the proposed confidentiality order. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/1/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 27, 2013 Filing 68 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Camille Buttiglione. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 26, 2013 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Strike #52 Reply/Response,, filed by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Affidavit)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.][Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting request of plaintiffs for an extension of seven days to submit their reply papers until February 26, 2013. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 2/20/13. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 13, 2013 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Scheduling Conference held on 2/13/2013. Appearances: J. Nelson Thomas, Esq. and Justin M. Cordello, Esq. for plaintiffs; Erin W. Smith, Esq. for defendants (CAM) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Parties may engage in factual discovery as agreed to in the 12/4/2012 #44 Discovery and Scheduling Order. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 3/15/2013. Parties to advise the Court in writing by 2/28/2013 re: status of any disputes regarding electronically-stored information and the proposed confidentiality order. Plaintiffs' counsel to advise the Court in writing within 10 days following the district court's ruling on plaintiffs' Section 216(b) notification motion. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 2/13/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 12, 2013 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Hicks re #62 Status Report Requesting Evidentiary Hearing (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 12, 2013 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT Requesting Evidentiary Hearing by Ashley Hicks. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 12, 2013 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashley Hicks re #60 Status Report (Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 11, 2013 Filing 60 STATUS REPORT by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 11, 2013 Filing 59 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #55 MOTION to Strike #52 Reply/Response,, filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 8, 2013 Filing 58 DISCOVERY PLAN by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
February 4, 2013 Filing 57 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Rebecca Marsicovetere. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 30, 2013 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael A. Telesca: Motion was submitted without oral argument on 1/24/2013 re #24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, John A. Perry, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., David A. Stein, TLC North, LLC, TLC West, LLC, Matthew J. Fairbairn, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC Central LLC. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 28, 2013 Filing 55 MOTION to Strike #52 Reply/Response,, by Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2013 11:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 1/25/2013. (KAH) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 25, 2013 Filing 53 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Kristin Hess. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
January 7, 2013 Filing 52 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Reply Memo of Law, #2 Declaration of E.W. Smith, #3 Exhibit A-E to E.W. Smith Declaration, #4 Declaration of S. Sabio, #5 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 17, 2012 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 17, 2012 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 17, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Kimball Cook on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cook, Jared) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 17, 2012 Filing 48 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Tara Lester. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 14, 2012 Filing 47 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Danielle Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 12/5/12. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER withdrawing #11 Motion to Certify Class; withdrawing #14 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 12/4/12. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, Tolling Agreement, Stipulated Discovery and Scheduling Order. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 12/4/12. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 3, 2012 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 3, 2012 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 3, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Benson on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Benson, Craig) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
December 3, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Elena Paraskevas-Thadani on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Paraskevas-Thadani, Elena) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 16, 2012 Filing 39 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Kristine Pappas. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
November 1, 2012 Filing 38 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Cynthia Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 24, 2012 Filing 37 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Rebecca Forman. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 24, 2012 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. David A. Stein served on 10/3/2012, answer due 10/25/2012. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 24, 2012 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. David A. Stein served on 10/4/2012, answer due 10/25/2012; T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill served on 10/4/2012, answer due 10/25/2012; T.L. Cannon Management Corp. served on 10/4/2012, answer due 10/25/2012; TLC North, LLC served on 10/4/2012, answer due 10/25/2012. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 24, 2012 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. Matthew J. Fairbairn served on 10/5/2012, answer due 10/26/2012. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting request of parties to extend the deadlines on all pending motions (Dkt. Nos. 11, 14, 24) until the parties have agreed upon a proposed scheduling order for this Court's approval. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 10/24/12. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting defendants' request to extend the time for them to answer until December 3, 2012. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 10/24/12. (JMC) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 31 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Demi Bouck. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2012 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. John A. Perry served on 10/17/2012, answer due 11/7/2012. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2012 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. John A. Perry served on 10/8/2012, answer due 10/29/2012. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 18, 2012 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. TLC Central LLC served on 10/5/2012, answer due 10/26/2012; TLC Utica, LLC served on 10/5/2012, answer due 10/26/2012; TLC West, LLC served on 10/5/2012, answer due 10/26/2012. (Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 27 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Ryan Hilerio. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 10, 2012 Filing 26 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Tasheena Salvary. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Form)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 9, 2012 Filing 25 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Dawn Draper, Deanna Halacy, Kelly Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 9, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue by Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin W. Smith, #2 Exhibit A-C to E. Smith Declaration, #3 Exhibit D-G to E. Smith Declaration, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #5 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Erin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 23 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Meaghann Anger, Sarah Click, Amber Dewey, Stephanie Pati, Heather Straccamore. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Jeffrey Evans, Jason Jannotti, Abra Macaluso. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Melissa Barone, Samantha Margillo, Marilyn Sider. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Candice Rodriguez, Melissa Rohrbaugh, Kimberly Rollek, Ashley Rose, Jessica Roseboom, Stefan Rosenthal, Elena Rossetti, Rachel Rosso, Kristen Roth, Letamarie Roy, Patrick Russell, Tonya Rutkowski, Kenneth Ryder, Kelley Sabino, Ariel Saccoccio, Bobbijo Salkeld, Samantha Salzarulo, Erica Scally, Lindsay Schmit, Deborah Schoonmaker, Rebecca Schuler-Leybot, Jennifer Schwaed, Rachel Schwartzback, Jeremy Scinta, Olivia Scozzaro, Liann Scuadroni, Heather Sebastian, Tiffany Seda, Maura Seever, Lisa Seymour, Jennifer Sheremeta, Adora Sherman, Deborah Sherrange, Jessica Siler-Vennard, Bonnie Silverman, Brittany Simpson, Darren Sinnott, Sarah Sitarski, Kristen Slingerland, Amanda Smith, Jeanette Smith, Lyndsay Smith, Meghan Smith, Nicole Smith, Melissa Snell, Kathryn Sobczak, Barbara Soluri, Maria Verderame Sotire, Pamela Spiesman, Anita Sprague, Marlo Squadere, Jennifer Stenken, Beth Stevens, Sarah Stevens, Timothy Stevens, Joseph Stewart, Sarah Stine, Gabrie Stolt, Kristin Strong, Jason Sturdevant, Krista Sweeney, Matthew Syfrett, Jodi Tamburrino, Chris Taylor, Jr., Joanna Thacker, Catherine Tibbetts, Lauren Titus, Danielle Todd, Meghan Tonery, Julie Torrens, Jessica Torrez, Megan Trask, Michelle Trask, Kelly Tripi, Bridgid Tronetti, Gina Tucker, Michelle Tunison, Cristy Tutt, Christina Valerio, Keri VanVoorhis, Abby Vanderbrook, Tiffany Vinci, Lisa Walkup, Kimberly Walrath, Sara Walsh, Gail Watson, Jessica Wegener, David Wegrzyn, Megan Weller, Kelly Weyer, Matthew Weyer, Hannah White, Karry Williams, Kayla Williams, Stuart Williams, Tina Wilson, Daniel Wiser, Cheryl Wright, Melissa Young, Aubrey Zegarelli, Katherine Zuber. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 19 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Karen Harris, Kyle Harris, Elizabeth Hartz, Larkin Harvey, Futami Hasbrouck, Jennifer Hayes, Angela Henderson, Lester Henderson, Lacey Heter, Amanda Hickey, Ashley Hicks, Kathleen Higgins, Anne Winters Hill, Katabbatha Hilligus, Matthew Hills, Sarah Hjort, Diana Hobbib-Shanks, Mariah Hoeber, Amber Holtz, Daniel Horbachewski, Patricia Hunter, Elyssa Huntington, Caryn Hurley, Raymond Hurst, Morgan Hyer, Kelly Inglut, Jessica Iuppa, Kathryn Jemma, Danielle Jewell, Raegan Johnson, Taylor Johnson, Amy Jones, LaToya Jones, Lindsay Jordan, Jaime Kahl, Sara Kaminski, Sonya Kelley, Stacy Kelsey, Kimberly Kendziora, Alexandra Kennedy, Amanda Kinnicutt, Scott Klein, Brittany Knuth, Katie Kostoroski, Barbara Kubiak, Kristina Kuscht, Karina Lamonica, Keith Land, Tina Lapiana, Charlene Larson, Tricia Lasher, Alyson LeBeau, Kristen LeDonne, Jessica Leahey, Rolland Lee, Michele Leppard, Tanya Lester, Doris Licari, Alissa Liddick, Erica Lomio, Amanda Loos, Anastasia Lopez, Lanna-Rae Lynch, Mariah Lynch, Jonelle MacDonald, Stephanie MacInerney, Dacey Madigan, Christina Maduro, Stephanie Magura, Jennifer Major-Denicola, Gerald Maloney, Michael Malowski, Amanda Marion, James Marsden, James Mason, Gina Mattice, Christopher Mazzu, Nicole McCoy, Bridget McCre-Marshall, Joshua McGinley, Joseph McGinnis, Jessica McUmber, George Melendez, Ashly Merulla, Samantha Meyer, Elise Miles, Benjamin Millard, Aaron Miller, Kathryn Miller, Marlena Miller, Melissa Miller, James Miller, Jr., Seth Millet, Rose Montanez, Joan Montuori, Sean Mooney, Jessica Mootz, Lilian Mullen, Kaylee Munroe, Meaghan Murphy, Nicholas Murray, Siobhan Murtagh, Marjorie Myers, Jessica Naliski, Shelly Natrigo, Brandi Neugent, Kaylee Neureuther, Christina Nichols, Stephanie Niedermayer, Jennifer Norgrove, Beth O'Brien, Pamela O'Shei, Christopher Paine, Kelli Paluch, Amanda Paonessa, Giovanna Pasquale, Jessica Patchin, Tiffany Pedro, Brieyn Pero, Sarah Perrin, Shannon Perry, Stephanie Perry, Jessica Persons, Patricia Petrone, Tracy Petrosky, Angela Pfeifer, Jillian Phelps, Angela Picarazzi, Amanda Pizzella, Caitlin Poirier, Heather Pollock, Alyssa Powers, Heidi Prentice, Lindsay Pskowski, Anja Rakic, Kristin Raymond, Crystal Reed, Colleen Reid, Jessica Reinhardt, Colin Rennia, Brandi Renquin, Amanda Resue, Karen Reszel, Rebeka Reta, Michael Reyes, Alyssa Reynolds, Amy Rhoda, Casey Rice, Robert Richie, Jennel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 4, 2012 Filing 18 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Karen Alaimo, Melissa Amato, Jill Andrade, Dallas Andrakulic, Matthew Armstrong, Craig Arnold, Keli Babcock, Brian Bailey, Laurie Balcom, Lucy Barajas, Amy Barber, Amanda Barber, Jennifer Barker, Joseph Baron, Steven Barone, Amanda Barrett, Danielle Bauchle, Ashley Baudendistel, Aimee Bausum, Korynn Bennedum, Eileen Betterley, Becki Bevier, Kristina Bierce, Kara Bonn, Lyla Bonnici, Alissa Brady, Melissa Brand, Alisha Brandon, Tiffany Bratz, Leanne Britt, Cara Brodfuehrer, Amy Brouillette, Audra Brouse, Zachary Bruce, Cherie Brutsman, Ashley Bryant, Beth Bunker, Naomi Burda, Miguel Calon, Ruth Camello, Alexandra Cannon, Rachel Cantor, Megan Carroll, Therese Cavalari, Vincent Cerra, Michael Champlin, Kimberly Chapman, Cristin Chappelle, Ashley Charres, Courtney Chicvak, Katie Chute, Sara Cipollo, Melissa Clark, Shana Cleveland, Matthew Cole, Colleen Conklin, Tamara Conn, Jillian Constable, Tracy Constantine, Justin Conte, Geraldine Corrigan, Rachel Cortesi, Amanda Cramer, Katrina Cranmer, Corey Creason, Shelly Cresanti, Stacey Cusick, Molly Czajka, Carey Czechowski, Mallory Czlonka, Karly Czupryriski, Latitia Daniels, Larry Davis, Jr., Lisa DeFrees, Taylor DeLeo, Kelli Dempsey, Lance DeWindt, Sharon DeWitt, Ashley Digati, Christina Diliberto, Shyla Dillenburg, Jerome Dillon, Stephen Doria, Alysa Downs, Jamie Doyle, Kourtney Drunn, Donna Drysdale Merchant, Richard Dubbs, Kimberly Duncan, Michael Dunn, Caitlin Dwyer, Sarah Eberle, Heather Edick, Julie Elmes, Alexandra Emanuel, Jessica Emke, Heidi Erickson, Melanie Esposito, Cynthia Everitt, Robin Faas, Jodi Fabrizio, Carmella Fallanca, Danielle Fazio, Anne Fazio, Jessica Feeney, Monique Fennelly, Victoria Ferguson, Andrealee Fernald, Stacy Fiacco, Rebecca Fischer, Alden Fischer, Jennifer Flye, Shanice Ford, Jennifer Forys, Dawn Foster, Emily Fowler, Nancy Fox, Samantha Frear, Sandra Friedrich, Anthony Fumarola, Erica Gagliardo, Gabrielle Garbacz, Brittany Garber, Tessa Gardner, Carly Gargan, Jessica Garling, Jessica Gendron, Shannon German, Jaymie Giordano, Carolyn Giordano, Joanna Gleason, Debralee Gordon, Gabriella Grandinetti, Kathryn Graser, Katelyn Greco, Mark Greenhow, Christopher Griffin, Eric Griffin, Jason Grower, Julie Gulino, Garnell Gunther, Kimberly Haddock, Jessica Hagerty, Catherine Hagerty, Stephanie Hanna, Lynn Harper, Carolanne Harris, Carhart Brigid, Esther Hadassah Gray, Eduardo Banks. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
October 2, 2012 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 27, 2012 Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 26, 2012 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act byAshley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 26, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 26, 2012 Filing 13 AFFIRMATION re #12 Memorandum in Support filed by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Errata F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit AB, #29 Exhibit AC, #30 Exhibit AD, #31 Exhibit AE, #32 Exhibit AF, #33 Exhibit AG, #34 Exhibit AH, #35 Exhibit AI, #36 Exhibit AJ, #37 Exhibit AK)(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 26, 2012 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act byAshley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 26, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act by Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond.(Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Cordello on behalf of Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond (Cordello, Justin) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Lingle on behalf of Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond (Lingle, Michael) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 5 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 3 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by J. Nelson Thomas on behalf of Ashley Hicks, Kristin Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Forms)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint - Summons for T.L. Cannon Corp. d/b/a Applebee's. (Attachments: #1 Summons for T.L. Cannon Management Corp., #2 Summons for TLC West, LLC, #3 Summons for TLC Central LLC, #4 Summons for TLC Utica, LLC, #5 Summons for TLC North, LLC, #6 Summons for David A. Stein, #7 Summons for David A. Stein, individually, #8 Summons for Matthew J. Fairbairn, #9 Summons for Matthew J. Fairbairn, individually, #10 Summons for John A. Perry, #11 Summons for John A. Perry, individually)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 24, 2012 Filing 10 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorney. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 24, 2012 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Matthew J. Fairbairn, John A. Perry, David A. Stein, T.L. Cannon Corp., d/b/a Applebee's or Applebee's Neighborhood Bar and Grill, T.L. Cannon Management Corp., TLC Central LLC, TLC North, LLC, TLC Utica, LLC, TLC West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 24, 2012 Filing 8 Notice of Right to consent to a Magistrate Judge. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]
September 24, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0209-1666995.), filed by Kristin Raymond, Ashley Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, J.) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/5/2013.] [Transferred from nynd on 8/27/2013.] [Transferred from New York Western on 10/1/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks et al v. T.L. Cannon Management Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Steitz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Bennett
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Blesinger
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah Hempstead
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Andersen
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Townsend
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Crane
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Moore
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Ehrgott
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Bonaventura
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Coutant
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Nies
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Biehn
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Pullano
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Hayes
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falesha Mechanick
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Salisbury
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Zapf
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Acquilano
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meaghan Hillery
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halley Collister
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Milligan
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Dillenburg
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Paradis
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dickman
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Smith
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Frasier, Jr.
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian LaValle
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Wagner
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Noel
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Driscoll
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Tompkins
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Percopo
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Phillips
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Gagnon
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Harris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Bryan
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Olivapotenza
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keli Locker
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Cook
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panida Promnoi
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadie Phoenix
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Fitzgerald
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Dawn Moreno
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Daniels
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McCarthy
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Damian
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Alvarado
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Yerico
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Taylor
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yavonna McMorris
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Snyder Hayes
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tresea Snyder
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Guido
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Speta
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Berg
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Wayman
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gates
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Olney
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Blackmer
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Socci
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Young
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilda Bermudez
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Giles
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Boylan
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Else Davis
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan McHale
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Mirando
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Selover
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Malek
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva LaFlesh
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Ortiz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallory Udick
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janett Vega
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maura Kinney-Palix
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Zakowski
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Carkner
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Montanaro
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickcole Miller
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Culver
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Kelleher
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Batza
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Bugarin
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Keeley
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Parker
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Caldwell
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Perkins
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa O'Bryan
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Tesoriero
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Battaglia
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Manley
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Velez
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Kondracki
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roodley Preval
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Murdoch
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Vaughn
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Yurksaitis
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Stites
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda McLane
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Infantino
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Flint
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Raymond
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Colleen Gale
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgina Mitchell
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Acevedo
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Deters
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Olinsky
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siobhan Cherry
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Huey
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Sainz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Edlen
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Heppner
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rochelle
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Mas
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisamarie Murphy
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Burgio
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Moss
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Nupp
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Geis
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Groover
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Yates
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylea Hayden
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Jones
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaina Urbanski
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Slater
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Anderson
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Carty
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amie Nix
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Palumbo
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Davis
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Englert
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Moore
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Copes
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Light
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Breen
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estelle Kreps
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Mauriello
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Love
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Nowatzki
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Mariano
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Sherwood
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsie Adams
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Light
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Reding
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Fanghella
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan LaMattina
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Milograno
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Hutton
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gegeny
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi-Lyn Heidenreich
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Coons
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica L. Lukasiewicz
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Jonathan W. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wa