Reddy et al v. Melnik

Appellee: Igor Y. Melnik
Appellant: Deepika Reddy and Pratap Reddy
Case Number: 3:2018cv01197
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File their brief until 1/23/19. The Bankruptcy Court Clerk is directed to transmit copies of both Plaintiff's Exhibits and Defendant's Exhibits listed in Docket Nos. 25, 29 and 32 that were admitted into evidence to the Court Clerk of the Northern District of New York to be included in the Record on Appeal. Any exhibits not admitted into evidence are not part of the Record on Appeal and will not be considered by this Court. Appellants are reminded that they may obtain copies of those admitted exhibits by paying the copying fee with the U.S. Bankruptcy Court Clerk. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 11/29/18. (lmw) (Copy served upon pro se appellants via regular mail)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief in Bankruptcy Appeal to District Court due to incomplete Record on Appeal filed by Deepika Reddy and Pratap Reddy. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (dpk)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice and ORDER: Bankruptcy Appeal set for 3/7/2019 on submission of briefs before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. No personal appearance. Appellant Brief due by 12/10/2018. Appellee's brief is due 40 days from the filing of Appellant's brief. Appellant's reply brief is due 20 days from the filing of the Appellee's brief. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/30/18. (lmw) (Copy served upon pro se appellants via regular mail)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Appellee's Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal filed by Igor Y. Melnik re #1 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Pre-Trial Statement, #2 Defendant's Post-Trial Memorandum)(usbcns, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 Appellants' Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues filed by Deepika Reddy, Pratap Reddy re: #1 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Defendant's Answer, #3 Joint Statement of Uncontested Facts, #4 Plaintiffs' List of Witnesses and Exhibits, #5 Plaintiffs' Contested Material Facts, #6 Letter filed by Lidiya Stewart, #7 Additional List of Exhibits filed by Plaintiff, #8 Court's Witnesses and Exhibits Logs, #9 Memorandum of Law (Plaintiffs' closing statement), #10 Transcript regarding trial held 3/13/2018, #11 Memorandum, Decision and Order, #12 Judgment)(usbcns, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance).(usbcns, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued. Plaintiffs Deepika Reddy amd Pratap Reddy acknowledge receipt. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Notice acknoledged by Pratap Reddy, #2 Mailing Envelope) (dpk)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal filed with the Bankruptcy Court on 10/4/2018 by Deepika Reddy and Pratap Reddy. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-80001. (usbcns, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reddy et al v. Melnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Igor Y. Melnik
Represented By: Mary Lannon Fangio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deepika Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pratap Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?