Shantz v. Union-Endicott Central School District

Plaintiff: Michael Shantz
Defendant: UNION ENDICOTT CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT and Union-Endicott Central School District
Case Number: 3:2018cv01315
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
0 Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
1 Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Union-Endicott Central School District re #14 Reply to Response to Motion (Spagnoli, Charles)
January 7, 2019 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Union-Endicott Central School District. (Spagnoli, Charles)
December 31, 2018 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Shantz re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Benjamin, Ronald)
December 31, 2018 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Michael Shantz. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Attorney Affirmation, #2 Exhibit(s) A-4/28/18 verified notice of claim, #3 Exhibit(s) B-5/8/18 demand for examination pursuant to general municipal law 50-h, #4 Exhibit(s) C-proposed amended complaint, #5 Memorandum of Law in opposition to the motion to dismiss and in support of cross-motion to remand)(Benjamin, Ronald)
December 21, 2018 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Union-Endicott Central School District re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Spagnoli, Charles)
December 21, 2018 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2019 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 1/8/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/14/2019. filed by Union-Endicott Central School District. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer Kazmark, #2 Memorandum of Law) (Spagnoli, Charles)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 TEXT ORDER : Due to the anticipated dispositive motion that will be filed in this action and upon verbal consent of the parties, the in person Rule 16 Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 12:00 PM is adjourned without date pending a decision on the anticipated motion. The deadline for filing a Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of mandatory disclosures is stayed at this time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 12/17/2018. (sal )
December 17, 2018 The Civil Case Management Plan was due to be filed on or before 12/14/2018, which has not yet been accomplished. Parties are directed to promptly file this document in preparation of the in person Rule 16 Conference scheduled for 12/21/18 at 12:00 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Peebles. (sal, )
November 16, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Union-Endicott Central School District re #7 Answer to Complaint (Miller, Frank)
November 16, 2018 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Shantz by Union-Endicott Central School District.(Miller, Frank)
November 16, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles C. Spagnoli on behalf of Union-Endicott Central School District (Spagnoli, Charles)
November 12, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Broome County Supreme Court on 11/09/2018, filed by UNION ENDICOTT CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Miller, Frank)
November 12, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Ronald R. Benjamin, Esq. on 11/09/2018, filed by UNION ENDICOTT CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Miller, Frank)
November 9, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for UNION ENDICOTT CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT answer due 11/16/2018. (khr)
November 9, 2018 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/21/2018 12:00 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/14/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
November 9, 2018 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by UNION ENDICOTT CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. (khr)
November 9, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court County of Broome, case number EFCA 2018-002577 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4562905) filed by UNION ENDICOTT CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shantz v. Union-Endicott Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shantz
Represented By: Ronald R. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION ENDICOTT CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Frank W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union-Endicott Central School District
Represented By: Frank W. Miller
Represented By: Charles C. Spagnoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?