United States of America v. Personius et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Geanne Kilts, Jeannie Kilts, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Thomas H. Personius, New York State Affordable Housing Corporation, Amy Carl, Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Susan M. Kennedy aka Susan Marie KKennedy, deceased, Brian Leslee Dennis, John Doe 1-5, Jane Does 1-5, Jane Doe 1-5 and Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Susan M. Kennedy aka Susan Marie Kennedy, deceased
Case Number: 3:2019cv00161
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER : Clerk's entry of default has now been entered as to defendants Amy Carl, Brian Leslee Dennis, Geanne Kilts, New York State Affordable Housing Corporation, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, and Thomas H. Personius. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to either file a motion for default judgment or a status report on or before 5/1/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 4/1/2019. (sal )
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT: As to Amy Carl, Brian Leslee Dennis, Geanne Kilts, New York State Affordable Housing Corporation, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, and Thomas H. Personius - approving the #12 Request for Entry of Default, #15 Request for Entry of Default, #13 Request for Entry of Default, #10 Request for Entry of Default, #16 Request for Entry of Default, and #14 Request for Entry of Default. (rep)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to New York State Department of Taxation and Finance (corrected) by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Geanne Kilts by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Brian Leslee Dennis by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Amy Carl by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to New York State Affordable Housing Corporation by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to New York State Department of Taxation and Finance by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Thomas H. Personius by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER : According to the docket sheet, the deadline for defendants Amy Carl, Brian Leslee Dennis, Geanne Kilts, New York State Affordable Housing Corporation, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, and Thomas H. Personius to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint has expired. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to either file a request for clerk's entry of default or a status report as to the above referenced defendants on or before 4/2/2019. The court notes that defendants Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Susan M. Kennedy aka Susan Marie Kennedy, deceased, John Does #1-5, and Jane Does #1-5 have not yet been identified. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 3/26/2019. (sal )
March 19, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Amy Carl answer due 3/20/2019; Brian Leslee Dennis answer due 3/21/2019; Geanne Kilts answer due 3/20/2019; New York State Affordable Housing Corporation answer due 3/18/2019; New York State Department of Taxation and Finance answer due 3/19/2019; Thomas H. Personius answer due 3/21/2019. (rep)
March 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Thomas H. Personius, as Voluntary Administrator of the Estate of Susan M. Kennedy aka Susan Marie Kennedy, deceased; on 2/28/2019, filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on New York State Department of Taxation and Finance on 2/26/2019, filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 16, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on New York State Affordable Housing Corporation on 2/25/2019, filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Geanne Kilts aka Jeannie Kilts; on 2/27/2019, filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Brian Leslee Dennis on 2/28/2019, filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
March 16, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Amy Carl on 2/27/2019, filed by United States of America. (Manfredi, John)
February 8, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R.CIV.P. 15 and summonses will be issued at that time. (jdp, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Amy Carl, Brian Leslee Dennis, Geanne Kilts, New York State Affordable Housing Corporation, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Thomas H. Personius, Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Susan M. Kennedy aka Susan Marie KKennedy, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(jdp, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR ACTION TO FORECLOSE A MORTGAGE against Amy Carl, Brian Leslee Dennis, John Doe 1-5, Jane Does 1-5, Geanne Kilts, New York State Affordable Housing Corporation, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Thomas H. Personius, Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Susan M. Kennedy aka Susan Marie KKennedy, deceased filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Personius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geanne Kilts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Kilts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Personius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Affordable Housing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Susan M. Kennedy aka Susan Marie KKennedy, deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Leslee Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Susan M. Kennedy aka Susan Marie Kennedy, deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John S. Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?