Lainhart v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Howard Lainhart
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00213
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Pursuant to a phone call with the filer, the docket text for docket #7 has been corrected from Social Security Plaintiff's Brief to Social Security Consent/Declination form as the filer mistakenly used the wrong event to file the document. The inadvertently set defendant's brief deadline of 4/19/2019 has been terminated. (meb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECUIRTY CONSENT / DECLANATION FORM filed by Howard Lainhart advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Defendant Brief due by 4/19/2019. (Gorton, Peter) Modified on 3/5/2019 to correct the docket text as this was mistakenly filed as a plaintiff's brief (meb).
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Desir appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 5/23/2019. (Desir, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that the Social Security Consent/Declination Form is due by 3/8/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/19/2019. (nmk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 3/8/2019. (sfp, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Howard Lainhart. (sfp, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (sfp, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Assignment of Atty's Fees, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lainhart v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Lainhart
Represented By: Peter A. Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: James Desir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?