VVA Phase III, LLC v. Hilti, Inc.

Plaintiff: VVA Phase III, LLC
Defendant: Hilti, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00818
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 9/25/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 1/31/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/28/2019. (jdp, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 14. Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse. Joinder of Parties due by 10/21/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2019. Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Motions to be filed by 11/30/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 1/31/2020. Status Report due by 11/6/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/28/2019. (jdp )
August 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/28/2019; SPP:N. Marlow-Jones for the Plaintiff and M. Lenahan, Esq. for the Defendant. Mandatory Mediation to be completed by 1/31/2020. Pretrial deadlines are discussed and set; Pretrial Order to be issued. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/6/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Plaintiff is directed to initiate the call to chambers, which can be reached at 607-79-2628. Counselors are reminded that the scheduling and deadlines reflected in the Pretrial Order are firm. (jdp )
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Hilti, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to Declaration of R. Anthony Rupp III in Opposition, #2 Exhibit(s) B to Declaration of R. Anthony Rupp III in Opposition, #3 Memorandum of Law)(Rupp, R.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Hilti, Inc.. (Rupp, R.)
August 12, 2019 MOTION SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. will be taken on submit. No oral argument will be held unless otherwise notified by the Court. (bjw, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. Response to Motion due by 8/27/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. filed by VVA Phase III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #7 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law) (Marlow-Jones, Nicole)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: GRANTING Letter Motion #10 . The Rule 16 In Person conference scheduled for 8/21/2019 is RESCHEDULED for 8/28/2019 at 12 (Noon) in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/21/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/1/2019. (jdp )
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Nicole Marlow-Jones for VVA Phase III, LLC requesting adjournment of August 21, 2019 conference . (Marlow-Jones, Nicole)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Marlow-Jones on behalf of VVA Phase III, LLC (Marlow-Jones, Nicole)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Smith on behalf of VVA Phase III, LLC (Smith, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hilti, Inc.. (Rupp, R.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Hilti, Inc..(Rupp, R.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilti, Inc. of mailing of Notice of Removal, etc. (Rupp, R.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hilti, Inc.. (Rupp, R.)
July 10, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Hilti, Inc. answer due 7/16/2019. (meb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/14/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to the #1 Notice of Removal filed by Hilti, Inc. (meb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tompkins County Supreme Court, case number EF2019-0254 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4793162) filed by Hilti, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VVA Phase III, LLC v. Hilti, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilti, Inc.
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VVA Phase III, LLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Ryan
Represented By: Nicole M. Marlow-Jones
Represented By: Robert J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?