Robertson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ivee Marcella Robertson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00996
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Ivee Marcella Robertson advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Olinsky, Howard)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stewart Amelia appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 11/18/2019. (Amelia, Stewart)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER : Having considered the application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. 1915, plaintiff's #3 in forma pauperis application is GRANTED. Pursuant to General Order No. 18 of this District, the defendant shall file a certified transcript of the administrative proceedings, which shall constitute as the defendant's answer, within 90 days of said service, or a motion to dismiss the complaint within 90 days of said service. So Ordered Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/15/2019. (jdp )
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 9/3/2019. (see)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ivee Marcella Robertson. (see)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (see)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Stewart Amelia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivee Marcella Robertson
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?