Philip v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Barbara J Pero and Pero Philip
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv01132
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: A previous text order 22 was issued on 10/24/2019 and to date there has been no response. Court is issuing another Order and the Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a letter with this Court by 11/22/2019 advising if the Plaintiff intends to proceed as Pro Se or if Plaintiff has retained an attorney in this matter. Of the Plaintiff intends to have an Attorney represent them in this matter, provide the Court the name, address, phone number and email of the Attorney. If Plaintiff intends to proceed Pro Se, a letter needs to be provided advising the Court the Plaintiff's full address and at least one telephone number contact. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/4/2019. (Copy served on Plaintiff via regular and certified)(jdp )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a letter with this Court by 11/1/2019 advising this Court if Plaintiff intends to proceed as Pro Se or if Plaintiff has retained an attorney in this matter. If the Plaintiff intends to have an Attorney represent them in this matter, provide to the Court the name, address, phone number and email of the Attorney. If Plaintiff intends to proceed Pro Se, then provide in the letter to the Court plaintiff's full address and at least one telephone number contact. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/24/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(jdp )
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Rogers, James)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a status within 5 days from this order, if they intend to proceed as Pro Se or if Counsel will be representing them. If the Plaintiff intends to have an Attorney represent them in this matter, please inform the Court as to the name, address, phone number and email of the Attorney. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/30/2019.
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Directing Attorney James F. Rogers, Esq. to file a Notice of Appearance within 5 days from todays order, if he intends to represent the Defendants in this matter.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/30/2019. (jdp)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/23/2019. (jdp, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4877724. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #12 Notice of Appearance (Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #13 Notice of Appearance (Scarpello, Tracey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Scarpello, Tracey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Quinn, Vivian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Letter of Richard B. North, Jr., dated 9/17/2019 advising he will not be representing defendants in this action. (re #10 Notice of Admission Requirement) (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney William Rivera Alvarez, Esq., Email address is william@masstortslaw.com. Phone number is 415-529-7016. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Christopher Kyle Johnston, Esq., Email address is kyle@masstortslaw.com. Phone number is 844-345-3784. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-02395. electronically transferred when case opened
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Northern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #5 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Short Form Complaint filed by Pero Philip. Document entered in wrong case. All documents must be filed in the lead case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Short Form Complaint by Pero Philip. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarez, William) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-2395-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15784282 filed by Pero Philip. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philip v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J Pero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pero Philip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?