DOE v. Cornell University et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Defendant: Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald, Cornell University, David Forbes Delchamps, William Carpenter, Cornell University Police Department, Lance R Collins, Luke Zachary Fenchel and College of Engineering
Case Number: 3:2019cv01189
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
2 Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #12 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Answer to Amended Complaint. Defendants' Counsel filed the FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure as an Attachment to their Answer. The Clerk has extracted the document and filed it under the proper event filing category. (mgh)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cornell University. (mgh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Carpenter, College of Engineering, Lance R Collins, Cornell University, Cornell University Police Department, David Forbes Delchamps, Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald re #10 Answer to Amended Complaint, (Wolan, Conrad) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/30/2019) (mgh, ).
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by William Carpenter, College of Engineering, Lance R Collins, Cornell University, Cornell University Police Department, David Forbes Delchamps, Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald.
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. William Carpenter served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; College of Engineering served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; Lance R Collins served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; Cornell University served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; Cornell University Police Department served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; David Forbes Delchamps served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; Luke Zachary Fenchel served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 as to Cornell Univ. College of Engineering, #2 as to Cornell Univ. Police Dept., #3 as to Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald, #4 as to David Forbes Delchamps, #5 as to Lance R. Collins, #6 as to Luke Fenchel)(mgh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #7 as to William Carpenter) (mgh, ).
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against William Carpenter, College of Engineering, Lance R Collins, Cornell University, Cornell University Police Department, David Forbes Delchamps, Luke Zachary Fenchel, Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald filed by JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(jel, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order of Recusal Dkt #7 served on Plaintiff via regular mail. (mgh)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Brenda K. Sannes recused. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino for all further proceedings, Judge Brenda K. Sannes no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 9/30/2019. (mgh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Motion #5 is hereby DENIED, without prejudice. Plaintiff John Doe motion to obtain ECF Login and Password is denied at this time, without prejudice to renew at the In Person Rule 16 initial conference. The Rule 16 In Person initial conference is scheduled for 1/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton, New York and Plaintiff may renew the motion at that initial conference. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/26/2019. (Copy served on Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail)(jdp )
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by JOHN DOE. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (pjh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to John Doe at the time the complaint was filed. (pjh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William Carpenter.(Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to College of Engineering, #2 Summons Issued as to Lance Collins, #3 Summons Issued as to Cornell University, #4 Summons Issued as to David Forbes Delchamps, #5 Summons Issued as to Luke Zachary Fenchel, #6 Summons Issued as to Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald, #7 Summons Issued as to Cornell University Police Department)(pjh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Carpenter, College of Engineering, Lance R Collins, Cornell University, Cornell University Police Department, David Forbes Delchamps, Luke Zachary Fenchel and Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald (Filing fee $400 receipt number SYR055920) filed by JOHN DOE.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet){Clerk notes that there are two complaints with two different causes of action as one document which was requested by the Pro Se litigant.(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. Cornell University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Gilmore-Fitzgerald
Represented By: Conrad R. Wolan
Represented By: Valerie L. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell University
Represented By: Conrad R. Wolan
Represented By: Valerie L. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Forbes Delchamps
Represented By: Conrad R. Wolan
Represented By: Valerie L. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Carpenter
Represented By: Conrad R. Wolan
Represented By: Valerie L. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell University Police Department
Represented By: Conrad R. Wolan
Represented By: Valerie L. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance R Collins
Represented By: Conrad R. Wolan
Represented By: Valerie L. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Zachary Fenchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College of Engineering
Represented By: Conrad R. Wolan
Represented By: Valerie L. Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?