Kelly v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association Securitized Asset Backed Receivable Mortgage Pass-Though Certificate - Wells Fargo 101 et al
Plaintiff: Heather Kelly
Defendant: Fremont Investment and Loan, Wells Fargo Bank National Association Securitized Asset Backed Receivable Mortgage Pass-Though Certificate - Wells Fargo 101 and Joseph F. Cawlery
Case Number: 3:2019cv01366
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
2 Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Heather Kelly. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (pjh)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: On 11/13/2019 the court directed plaintiff to submit a new IFP application in which she must answer paragraph 3 of the form, in which it asks how much income she received from the other sources she has indicated in paragraph 3(a) and 3(b) by 12/2/2019. To date, plaintiff has not submitted a new application. In light of plaintiff's pro se status, the court hereby extends the deadline for plaintiff to submit the new IFP application to 1/9/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/10/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's #3 Motion to proceed without payment of fees is STAYED AT THIS TIME, and it is ORDERED, that the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a new application to proceed IFP, and it is ORDERED, that by MONDAY, DECEMBER 2, 2019, Plaintiff must properly complete and file the new IFP application by fully answering paragraph 3 of the form,in which it asks how much income she received from the other sources she has indicated in paragraph 3(a) and 3(b), and it is ORDERED, that when Plaintiff has resubmitted a properly completed application, the Clerk return this action to me for initial review. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/13/2019. {Clerk served copy upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail}(pjh)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter for all further proceedings. U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 11/7/2019. {Copy served upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail}(pjh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (pjh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed. Pro Se Plaintiff was also provided with a copy of the Local Rules. (pjh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Heather Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Wells Fargo Bank National Association Securitized Backed Receivable Mortgage Pass-Through Certificate - Wells Fargo 101, #2 Proposed Summons as to Fremont Investment and Loan, #3 Proposed Summons as to Joseph F. Cawlery) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (pjh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Joseph F. Cawlery, Fremont Investment and Loan, Wells Fargo Bank National Association Securitized Asset Backed Receivable Mortgage Pass-Though Certificate - Wells Fargo 101 filed by Heather Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association Securitized Asset Backed Receivable Mortgage Pass-Though Certificate - Wells Fargo 101 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Investment and Loan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association Securitized Asset Backed Receivable Mortgage Pass-Though Certificate - Wells Fargo 101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F. Cawlery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?