Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America et al v. J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raymond Corporation and Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01397
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Anthony D. Luis for J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. requesting that conference be rescheduled; submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Luis, Anthony)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service by Raymond Corporation. (Somerstein, Bruce)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Somerstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Somerstein, Bruce)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Answer)(Luis, Anthony)
November 14, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. answer due 11/20/2019. (see)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiffs; Attorney Christopher A. Wong. Phone number is 212-268-1188. Admissions due by 11/27/2019. {Mailed to Attorney Wong on 11/14/2019 by regular mail}(see)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 02:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/8/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. for J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(see)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Broome County, case number EFCA2019002963 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4941369) filed by J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America et al v. J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Corporation
Represented By: Bruce Somerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Bruce Somerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Luis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?