Perez et al v. Escobar Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Eduardo Sanchez Arias and Marco Antonio Perez Perez
Defendant: Jhony A Escobar, Escobar Construction, Inc. and Nations Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01623
Filed: December 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jose Eduardo Sanchez Arias, Marco Antonio Perez Perez Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendant JHONY A. ESCOBAR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 01 Waiver of Service Form)(Troy, John)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 DUPLICATE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Antonio Perez Perez, Jose Eduardo Sanchez Arias. (Troy, John) Modified on 1/24/2020 (khr).
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Antonio Perez Perez, Jose Eduardo Sanchez Arias. Escobar Construction, Inc. served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (sfp, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Pltf; Attorney Aaron Schweitzer. Phone number is (718) 762-1324. Admissions due by 1/13/2020. [Served by mail.](sfp, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/25/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jhony A Escobar, Escobar Construction, Inc., Nations Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sfp, )
December 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jhony A Escobar, Escobar Construction, Inc., Nations Construction, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4984624) filed by Marco Antonio Perez Perez, Jose Eduardo Sanchez Arias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) Tompkins County is used for jurisdiction because all the construction work took place in Ithaca which is Tompkins County. (sfp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Escobar Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhony A Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escobar Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Eduardo Sanchez Arias
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Perez Perez
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?