Bollinger Industries, Inc. v. Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Bollinger Industries Inc., and Bollinger Industries Inc., doing business as Alliance Sports Group, LP
Defendant: Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD., Mark Tucker and Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD. doing business as E-Z Red Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00095
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by James Billingsley on behalf of Bollinger Industries Inc., (Billingsley, James)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bollinger Industries Inc.,. (Nagi, Jason)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 in-person initial conference scheduled for 4/1/2020 at 12:00 p.m., has changed in that it will now be conducted via telephone conference. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to initiate the conference call. Once all participants are on the line, place the call to chambers at 607-779-2628. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/16/2020. (jdp )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Amended ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, /Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Bollinger Industries Inc.'s Amended Answer to Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs' Counterclaims by Bollinger Industries Inc.,.(Nagi, Jason)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin G. Goodman on behalf of Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD. (Goodman, Benjamin)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/13/2020. (jdp, )
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James H. Billingsley Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5027989. filed by Bollinger Industries Inc.,. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Nagi, Jason)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: Motion #28 is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Initial Conference currently set for 3/18/2020 is Adjourned and Re-Scheduled for 4/1/2020 at 12:00 Noon at the U.S. Courthouse 15 Henry Street, Binghamton, New York, before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/25/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (Parties served electronically). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/10/2020. (jdp )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Reschedule Rule 16 Conference re #21 G.O. 25 Filing Order, (Unopposed) filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD.. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Breaux, Ronald)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD. re #19 Notice of Admission Requirement, - Notice of Intent to Remain Defendants' Counsel of Record (Breaux, Ronald)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/10/2020. (jdp, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/10/2020. (jdp, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 12:00 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/25/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, /Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Bollinger Industries Inc., Answer to Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs' Counterclaims by Bollinger Industries Inc.,.(Nagi, Jason)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin G. Goodman Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5021126. filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Sponsor Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) B - E-filing Registration, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Petition for Admission) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Pressment, Jonathan)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ronald W. Breaux Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5021107. filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Sponsor Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) B - E-filing Registration, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Petition for Admission) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Pressment, Jonathan)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/18/2020 at 1:00 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/11/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (Parties served electronically) (jdp )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Parties served electronically} (jmb)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to all defendants; Attorney Ronald W. Breaux, Esq., and Benjamin G. Goodman, Esq., Email address is ron.breaux@haynesboone.com and benjamin.goodman@haynesboone.com. Phone number is 214-651-5688 and 214-651-5440. Admissions due by 2/12/2020. {Copy served upon attorneys electronically} (jmb)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney James H. Billingsley, Email address is jbillingsley@polsinelli.com. Phone number is 214-661-5541. Admissions due by 2/12/2020. {Copy served upon attorney electronically} (jmb)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-01044. electronically transferred when case opened
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM has been RESCHEDULED for 3/18/2020 at 1:00 PM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton NY before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. (jdp )
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Binghamton Division of Northern District of New York. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/27/2020) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bollinger Industries Inc.,. Amendment to #11 Supplemental Document. (Plaintiff's Amended Supplementary Document Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue). (Billingsley, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2020. Motions due by 11/30/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/30/2020. Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2021. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning March 29, 2021 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/22/2020) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Bollinger Industries Inc.,. (Billingsley, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD, Mark Tucker Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., COUNTERCLAIM against Bollinger Industries Inc., filed by Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD, Mark Tucker (Breaux, Ronald) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Supplemental Document by Bollinger Industries Inc., as to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Plaintiff's Supplementary Document Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue). (Billingsley, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff file a supplementary document stating their opposition or lack thereof to Defendants' Motion to Transfer on or before January 7, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/6/2020) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Goodman, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D) (Breaux, Ronald) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Breaux, Ronald) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Breaux, Ronald) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 1/21/2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/23/2019) (trt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD, Mark Tucker. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement, #8 State Court Docket, #9 Index to State Court Pleadings, #10 Exhibit(s) 1, #11 Exhibit(s) 2, #12 Exhibit(s) 3, #13 Exhibit(s) 4, #14 Exhibit(s) 5, #15 Exhibit(s) 6, #16 Exhibit(s) 7, #17 Exhibit(s) 8, #18 Exhibit(s) 9, #19 Exhibit(s) 10, #20 Exhibit(s) 11, #21 Exhibit(s) 12, #22 Exhibit(s) 13, #23 Exhibit(s) 14, #24 Exhibit(s) 15, #25 Exhibit(s) 16, #26 Exhibit(s) 17, #27 Exhibit(s) 18, #28 Exhibit(s) 19, #29 Exhibit(s) 20, #30 Exhibit(s) 21, #31 Exhibit(s) 22, #32 Exhibit(s) 23, #33 Exhibit(s) 24, #34 Exhibit(s) 25) (Breaux, Ronald) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Defendant must file an amended notice of removal specifically addressing the pleading defects identified by the Court by January 2, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/19/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, Ltd., d.b.a. E-Z Red Company. (Breaux, Ronald) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 67th Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 067-292097-17 filed by Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, Ltd., d.b.a. E-Z Red Company, Mark Tucker. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10488754) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement, #8 State Court Docket, #9 Index of State Court Pleadings, #10 Exhibit(s) 1, #11 Exhibit(s) 2, #12 Exhibit(s) 3, #13 Exhibit(s) 4, #14 Exhibit(s) 5, #15 Exhibit(s) 6, #16 Exhibit(s) 7, #17 Exhibit(s) 8, #18 Exhibit(s) 9, #19 Exhibit(s) 10, #20 Exhibit(s) 11, #21 Exhibit(s) 12, #22 Exhibit(s) 13, #23 Exhibit(s) 14, #24 Exhibit(s) 15, #25 Exhibit(s) 16, #26 Exhibit(s) 17, #27 Exhibit(s) 18, #28 Exhibit(s) 19, #29 Exhibit(s) 20, #30 Exhibit(s) 21, #31 Exhibit(s) 22, #32 Exhibit(s) 23, #33 Exhibit(s) 24, #34 Exhibit(s) 25) (Breaux, Ronald) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 1/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollinger Industries, Inc. v. Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bollinger Industries Inc.,
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Represented By: James Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bollinger Industries Inc., doing business as Alliance Sports Group, LP
Represented By: James Billingsley
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD.
Represented By: Benjamin G. Goodman
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Breaux
Represented By: Jonathan D. Pressment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tucker
Represented By: Benjamin G. Goodman
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Breaux
Represented By: Jonathan D. Pressment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD. doing business as E-Z Red Company
Represented By: Benjamin G. Goodman
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Breaux
Represented By: Jonathan D. Pressment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?