Monroe v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: David A. Monroe
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00217
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Gregory Bruno regarding admission requirement. (dpk)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Bruno on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Bruno, Gregory)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Granting #4 Stipulation. Answer is now due for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/20/2020. (jdp )
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Caliber Home Loanes, Inc.; Attorney Gregory R. Bruno, Email address is gbruno@daypitney.com. Phone number is (212) 297-2445. Admissions due by 4/3/2020. {Emailed to attorney on 3/20/2020}(see)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LSF6 Service Operations, LLC for Caliber Home Loans, Inc... (Marks, Alfred)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred W.J. Marks on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Marks, Alfred)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. (Marks, Alfred)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (dpk)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 2:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Judge Lovric only conducts Rule 16 Initial Conferences IN PERSON in Binghamton, New York in all cases with no exceptions. Any request to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 initial conference will be DENIED. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/20/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5042821) filed by David A. Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Monroe
Represented By: Javier Luis Merino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred W.J. Marks
Represented By: Gregory Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?