C.E. v. Education Plus, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: C.E.
Defendant: Diocese of Albany, Education Plus, Corp., The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany and St. Paul the Apostle Church
Case Number: 3:2020cv00233
Filed: March 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Dziak on behalf of Education Plus, Corp. (Dziak, Melissa)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/27/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Diocese of Albany, Education Plus, Corp., St. Paul the Apostle Church. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sfp, )
March 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diocese of Albany, Education Plus, Corp., St. Paul the Apostle Church (Filing fee $400 receipt number 5045302) filed by C.E.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.E. v. Education Plus, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diocese of Albany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Education Plus, Corp.
Represented By: Melissa A. Dziak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Diocese of Albany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul the Apostle Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.E.
Represented By: Ralph DeSimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?