Oakes v. The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nancy Oakes
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00269
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Demand for Damages & Response to Demand)(Fritzson, Joseph)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bella Pevzner on behalf of The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. (Pevzner, Bella)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Sam Fritzson on behalf of The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. (Fritzson, Joseph)
March 20, 2020 MOTION SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #6 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2020 before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. will be taken on submit. No oral argument will be held. (bjw, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Oakes re #6 MOTION to Remand (Benjamin, Ronald)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: In light of the Motion to Remand #6 , the Rule 16 initial conference scheduled for 4/29/2020, the deadline for filing of case management plan, and the deadline for exchange of mandatory disclosures, are STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/19/2020.(jdp )
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin Jr. Response to Motion due by 4/7/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/13/2020. filed by Nancy Oakes. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Memorandum of Law) (Benjamin, Ronald)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 in-person initial conference scheduled for 4/29/2020 at 2:30 p.m., has changed in that it will now be conducted via telephone conference. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to initiate the conference call. Once all participants are on the line, place the call to chambers at 607-779-2628. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/17/2020.(jdp )
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed in Tioga County Supreme Court by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc..(Pevzner, Bella)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.. (Pevzner, Bella)
March 11, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. answer due 3/17/2020. (mgh)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/29/2020 02:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/22/2020. NOTE: Judge Lovric ONLY DOES RULE 16 INITIAL CONFERENCES IN PERSON in Binghamton, New York in all cases and no exceptions. Requests to appear by way of telephone conference at the Rule 16 initial conferencewill be DENIED. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Nancy Oakes. (mgh)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tioga County Supreme Court, case number 2019-60769 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5056861) filed by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B- Notice to Admit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakes v. The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Oakes
Represented By: Ronald R. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Bella Pevzner
Represented By: Joseph Sam Fritzson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?